Liguori et al v. Hansen et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Elayna J Youchah |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-00492 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:504 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2011 |
Re-opened: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 27, 2016 8:03 PM PST |
Counter Claimant
Bert Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Steve Liguori
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bert Hansen
443 Nevada Highway
Boulder City, NV 89005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruno Liguori Turquoise Trading, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Liguori
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kawana Pohe
Terminated: 06/11/2013
443 Nevada Highway
Boulder City, NV 89005 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
minord
Minute Order Return of Exhibits
Wed 10/04 2:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/4/2023. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen. The court currently has custody of exhibits in this action. It has been determined these exhibits can be returned to the parties. IT IS ORDERED that the parties have 21 days from the date of this order to claim the exhibits from the clerk under Local Rule 79-1 or exhibits shall be destroyed. Please contact Melissa_Johansen@nvd.uscourts.gov to make arrangements to have the exhibits picked up or said exhibits shall be destroyed by the court. Deadline to return exhibits set for 10/25/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) |