Vaigasi v. Solow Management Corp. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Berman |
Referred: | Henry B Pitman |
Case #: | 1:11-cv-05088 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2011 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2016 12:15 PM EDT |
Defendant
Sheldon Solow
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillip Wischerth
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Tumminia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Townhouse Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solow Realty & Development Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solow Management Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solow East River Development Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stefan Solow
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronan Kearney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nelson Genao
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Garraputa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alexander Ferreras
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Dedivanovic
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Callichio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Giovani Bernardino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedio Vaigasi
315 First Street Apt. #2
Hackensack, NJ 07601 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Phil Wischert
Terminated: 09/08/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Townhouse Co Solow Building Corp.
Terminated: 09/08/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Solow Realty Co. LLC
Terminated: 09/08/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Dedivanovick
Terminated: 09/08/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Callicchio
Terminated: 09/08/2011
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Giovani Bernadino
Terminated: 09/08/2011
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |