Vaigasi v. Solow Management Corporation
Original Case: 1:11-cv-05088
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-01189 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 1:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Townhouse Co Solow Building Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Solow Realty Co. LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ronan Kearney, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Solow Realty & Development Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Townhouse Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nelson Genao, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sheldon Solow, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Solow East River Development Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
George Dedivanovick, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Anthony Callicchio, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stefan Solow, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Alexander Ferreras, in his individual and official capacty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gregory Tumminia, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lisa Garraputa, in her individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Phillip Wischerth, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Giovani Bernardino, in his individual and official capacity
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Solow Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Pedio Vaigasi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 12:48 AM EST |
Thursday, April 16, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Pedio Vaigasi, FILED. [1486924] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 03:44 PM] | |
2 | 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/04/2015, RECEIVED.[1486948] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 03:56 PM] | |
3 | 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1486955] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 03:57 PM] | |
4 | 4 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/08/2015, RECEIVED.[1486956] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 03:58 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1486964] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 03:59 PM] | |
6 | 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[1486980] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 04:03 PM] | |
10 | 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Callicchio, George Dedivanovick, Alexander Ferreras, Lisa Garraputa, Nelson Genao, Ronan Kearney, Solow East River Development Co. LLC, Solow Management Corporation, Sheldon Solow, Stefan Solow and Phillip Wischerth in 15-1189 Appellee Giovani Bernardino, George Dedivanovick, Alexander Ferreras, Lisa Garraputa, Nelson Genao, Ronan Kearney, Solow East River Development Co. LLC, Solow Management Corporation, Sheldon Solow and Stefan Solow in 15-710, FILED. Service date 04/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1487066] 15-1189 15-710] [Entered: 04/16/2015 04:38 PM] | |
11 | 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [10], on behalf of Appellee Giovani Bernardino, Anthony Callicchio, George Dedivanovick, Alexander Ferreras, Lisa Garraputa, Nelson Genao, Ronan Kearney, Sheldon Solow, Stefan Solow, Solow East River Development Co. LLC, Solow Management Corporation, Gregory Tumminia and Phillip Wischerth, FILED.[1487074] 15-1189 [Entered: 04/16/2015 04:41 PM] |