New Jersey District Court
Judge:Katharine S Hayden
Case #: 2:15-cv-00242
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2015
Terminated:Sep 02, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jul 11, 2015 10:32 AM EDT
Appellant
NICHOLAS ELIAN
Represented By
JOHN P. DI IORIO
Shapiro, Croland, Reiser, Apfel & Di Iorio, LLP
contact info
Appellee
FRANK BERTUCCI
Represented By
MICHAEL J. FELDMAN
Olender Feldman, LLP
contact info
CHRISTIAN JOHN JENSEN
Olenderfeldman LLP
contact info
In Re
NICHOLAS ELIAN AND MARTHA MIQUEO-ELIAN
Notice Only
bknwk

GPO Sep 02 2015
OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/15. (rg, )
GPO Sep 02 2015
ORDER that the Bankruptcy Courts order dated July 14, 2014 is affirmed. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/15. (rg, )

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
12 12 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned) Wed 10/14 4:26 PM
USCA Case Number 15-3415 for11 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by NICHOLAS ELIAN. USCA Case Manager AINA (Document Restricted - Court Only) (OM3)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
11 11 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Fri 10/02 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Order by NICHOLAS ELIAN. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-6677173. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (DI IORIO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
10 10 order Order Wed 09/02 7:16 PM
ORDER that the Bankruptcy Courts order dated July 14, 2014 is affirmed. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/15. (rg, )
Related: [-]
9 9 15 pgs order Opinion Wed 09/02 7:11 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/15. (rg, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/02 7:18 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (rg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
8 8 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Fri 04/10 3:28 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by NICHOLAS ELIAN. (DI IORIO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
7 7 respoth Brief Fri 03/27 1:22 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to Appeal(JENSEN, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
6 6 order Order Wed 03/11 9:50 AM
ORDER granting Appellee Frank Bertucci a two (2) week extension of time within which to file his Opposition to Appellant's pending Appeal. Response will now be due on 3/27/2015. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/10/2015. (anr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/10 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN JOHN JENSEN on behalf of FRANK BERTUCCI (JENSEN, CHRISTIAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/10 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. FELDMAN on behalf of FRANK BERTUCCI (FELDMAN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
3 3 appeal Appellants Brief Wed 02/11 1:57 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by NICHOLAS ELIAN.(DI IORIO, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Monday, January 12, 2015
2 2 appeal Designation of Record on Appeal Tue 01/13 4:13 PM
APPELANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by NICHOLAS ELIAN re1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Katherine S. Hayden, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 2/11/2015. (anr)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 01/13 4:12 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 10-49482 (DS), filed by NICHOLAS ELIAN.(anr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order being Appealed,
Att: 2 Second Order being Appealed,
Att: 3 Transmittal of Record to USDC
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 01/13 4:19 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 4/20/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (anr)
Related: [-]