Original Case: 2:15-cv-00242

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-03415
Typecivil / private / bankruptcy
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2015
Terminated:Sep 27, 2016

Debtor
In re: NICHOLAS ELIAN

,
Represented By
John P. Di Iorio
Shapiro Croland
contact info
Debtor
MARTHA MIQUEO-ELIAN

,
Represented By
John P. Di Iorio
Shapiro Croland
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Oct 15, 2015 6:28 AM EDT
Plaintiff - Appellee
FRANK BERTUCCI
Represented By
Christian John Jensen
Olender Feldman LLP
contact info
Michael J. Feldman
Olender Feldman LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 27 2016
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: FISHER, GREENAWAY JR. and ROTH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 5. Judge: ROTH Authoring.

Docket last updated: 10/15/2015 6:28 AM EDT
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (OM)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Nicholas Elian in District Court No. 2-15-cv-00242. (OM)
Related: [-]