Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda K Martin
Case #: 2:15-bk-00679
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 24, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jun 15, 2015
Terminated:Mar 14, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Aug 26, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SkyMall, LLC fka SkyMall, Inc.
Quarles & Brady LLP One Renaissance Square Two North Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
JOHN A. HARRIS
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Debtor
SkyMall, LLC
Quarles & Brady LLP One Renaissance Square Two North Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
ROBERT P. HARRIS
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
JOHN A. HARRIS
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
LORI L. WINKELMAN
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
JASON D. CURRY
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Commitee of Unsecured Creditors of SkyMall, LLC et al.
Represented By
ERIC S. PEZOLD
Snell & Wilmer, LLP
contact info
EVANS O'BRIEN
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
STEVEN D. JEROME
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
Trustee
Grant Lyon, Liquidating Trustee for the SM Liquidating Trust
Represented By
EMILY GILDAR WAGNER
Snell & Wilmer, LLP
contact info
STEVEN D. JEROME
Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003
Represented By
ELIZABETH C. AMOROSI
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
LARRY L. WATSON
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. New Jersey Company Hopes To Revive SkyMall | NewsFactor Network (newsfactor.com)
Submitted Mon 04/06/2015
2. SkyMall has been saved (businessinsider.com)
Submitted Thu 04/02/2015
3. New SkyMall Owner May Relaunch Catalog (wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 03/28/2015
4. Judge Says SkyMall Can Stay Open Online Pending Sale (nasdaq.com)
Submitted Thu 01/29/2015
5. Airline catalog SkyMall files for bankruptcy (usatoday.com)
Submitted Fri 01/23/2015
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Thursday, April 19, 2018
903 903 other Post-Confirmation Report Thu 04/19 10:10 AM
Post-Confirmation Report. FINAL - Quarter Ending 03/31/2018 filed by STEVEN D. JEROME of SNELL & WILMER L.L.P. on behalf of Bryan Perkinson, Liquidating Trustee of the SM Liquidating Trust. Post-Confirmation Report due by 4/20/2018, (JEROME, STEVEN)
Related: [-]