Member Case
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-00679

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda K Martin
Case #: 2:15-bk-00685
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 24, 2015
Terminated:Mar 14, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SHC Parent Corp.
Pne Renaissance Square Two North Central Ave.
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
JOHN A. HARRIS
Quarles & Brady LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
38 38 order oFinal Decree (Closes Case) Wed 03/14 10:47 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases and Vacating March 21, 2018 Hearing signed on 3/14/2018 . (Dominguez, Rhianna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
37 37 order oRuling on Objection to Claim Fri 09/02 8:01 AM
ORDER Ruling on Objection to Claim 1 Related [+] signed on 8/31/2016 . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-] -Docketed to Enter on Claims Register32 Objection to Claim
36 36 order oGranting Wed 08/31 3:56 PM
ORDER Granting signed on 8/31/2016 Related [+] . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-] 32 Objection to Claim
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
35 35 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 08/30 12:04 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Liquidating Trustee's First Omnibus Objection to Duplicate Claims Regarding SHC Parent Corp. filed by EMILY GILDAR WAGNER of SNELL & WILMER, LLP on behalf of Grant Lyon, Liquidating Trustee for the SM Liquidating Trust Related [+].(WAGNER, EMILY)
Related: [-] 32 Objection to Claim
34 34 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Tue 08/30 12:02 PM
Certificate of Service and No Objections re Liquidating Trustee's First Omnibus Objection to Duplicate Claims Regarding SHC Parent Corp. filed by EMILY GILDAR WAGNER of SNELL & WILMER, LLP on behalf of Grant Lyon, Liquidating Trustee for the SM Liquidating Trust. Related [+] (WAGNER, EMILY)
Related: [-] 32 Objection to Claim,33 Notice of Bar Date
Thursday, August 04, 2016
33 33 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Thu 08/04 1:22 PM
Notice of Bar Date to Respond to Liquidating Trustee's First Omnibus Objection to Duplicate Claims Regarding SHC Parent Corp. filed by EMILY GILDAR WAGNER of SNELL & WILMER, LLP on behalf of Grant Lyon, Liquidating Trustee for the SM Liquidating Trust Related [+] Objections/Responses due by 8/18/2016,.(WAGNER, EMILY)
Related: [-] 32 Objection to Claim
32 32 claims Objection to Claim(s) Thu 08/04 1:20 PM
Omnibus Objection to Claim 1 'Liquidating Trustee's First Omnibus Objection to Duplicate Claims Regarding SHC Parent Corp." filed by EMILY GILDAR WAGNER of SNELL & WILMER, LLP on behalf of Grant Lyon, Liquidating Trustee for the SM Liquidating Trust. (WAGNER, EMILY)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2015
31 31 claims Withdrawal of Claim Tue 11/10 3:41 PM
Withdrawal of Claim 2 filed by SYLVESTER RAMIREZ on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Ventura, Ann Marie) Modified on 11/10/2015 (Ventura, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
30 30 other Operating Report Tue 09/22 9:55 AM
Monthly Operating Report For August 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
29 29 other Operating Report Wed 08/19 3:47 PM
Monthly Operating Report For July 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
28 28 other Operating Report Tue 07/28 11:53 AM
Monthly Operating Report For June 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
27 27 other Operating Report Mon 07/06 10:34 AM
Monthly Operating Report For May 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
26 26 other Operating Report Tue 06/02 2:20 PM
Monthly Operating Report For April 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
25 25 other Operating Report Thu 04/23 4:17 PM
Monthly Operating Report For March 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by LORI L. WINKELMAN of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (WINKELMAN, LORI)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
24 24 order oGranting Mon 04/20 2:21 PM
Copy of ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Order Amending the Form of Consolidated Caption In Accordance With Sale Order signed on 4/17/2015 . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
23 23 court Deficiency Memo (QC Form) Wed 03/18 7:25 AM
Deficiency Memo Related [+] (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-] 22 Operating Report
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
22 22 other Operating Report Tue 03/17 7:10 PM
Monthly Operating Report For January 2015 and February 2015 (Investment Entity Monthly Report) filed by LORI L. WINKELMAN of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (WINKELMAN, LORI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
21 21 notice 11 CREDITOR - Request for Notice (batch) (no document) Wed 03/04 8:23 AM
Request for Notice on Behalf of American Express Travel Related Services Co Inc. (WEISMAN, GILBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 27, 2015
20 20 trustee Minutes of 341 Meeting Fri 02/27 9:57 AM
Minutes of 341 Meeting Held & Continued to: 3/18/15 @ 1:30 p.m filed by LARRY L. WATSON of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE.(WATSON, LARRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
19 19 court Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 02/25 10:31 AM
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 23, 2015
18 18 other Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 02/23 11:21 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs filed by LORI L. WINKELMAN of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 03/2/2015, (WINKELMAN, LORI)
Related: [-]
17 17 other Schedules Mon 02/23 11:21 PM
Schedules filed by LORI L. WINKELMAN of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. Electronic Filing Declaration due by 03/2/2015,(WINKELMAN, LORI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summary of Schedules
Att: 2 Schedule A
Att: 3 Schedule B
Att: 4 Schedule C
Att: 5 Schedule D
Att: 6 Schedule E
Att: 7 Schedule F
Att: 8 Schedule G
Att: 9 Schedule H
Att: 10 Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules
Thursday, February 12, 2015
16 16 order oGranting Wed 02/18 10:39 AM
Amended ORDER Authorizing and Directing (1) Joint Administration, (2) Transferring Assignment of Cases to Same Judge, and (3) Use of a Consolidated Caption signed on 2/12/2015 . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 29, 2015
14 14 order oJoint Administration Thu 01/29 3:05 PM
ORDER for Joint Administration signed on 1/29/2015 . (Stangret, Wesley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
15 15 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Fri 01/30 11:08 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
12 12 court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Wed 01/28 11:27 AM
Amended to Change 341 Time - Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/24/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX) (Estrella, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 01/28 11:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
11 11 court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Mon 01/26 12:46 PM
**Amended** Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (Ventura, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 23, 2015
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/25 11:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)
9 9 court zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE) Sun 01/25 11:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part
8 8 court 2Set Missing Filings Deadlines Fri 01/23 10:07 AM
Schedules/Statements due by 2/5/2015. (Ventura, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part Fri 01/23 9:40 AM
Chapter 11 Corp/Part Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/24/2015 at 11:30 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX) (Ventura, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form) Fri 01/23 9:38 AM
Deficiency Notice to Debtor and Attorney for Debtor That All Required Documents Were Not Filed. (Ventura, Ann Marie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 22, 2015
5 5 other List of Equity Security Holders Thu 01/22 9:29 PM
List of Equity Security Holders filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 other Initial Mailing List Thu 01/22 8:51 PM
Master Mailing List filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp..(HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MML
3 3 other List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 01/22 7:37 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp.. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Thu 01/22 6:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 02/24/2015 at 11:30 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs other 2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1717.00 fee) Thu 01/22 5:49 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). The mailing list of creditors if not uploaded when the petition was filed, must be uploaded no later than seven days from the date of the filing of the petition. Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 02/12/2015, filed by JOHN A. HARRIS of QUARLES & BRADY LLP on behalf of SHC Parent Corp. (HARRIS, JOHN)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment Thu 01/22 8:07 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:15-bk-00685) [other,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24844993. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]