Wynwood Entertainment, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-11752 |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2015 |
Dismissed: | Jul 20, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Wynwood Entertainment, LLC
187 NW 28th St
Miami, FL 33127-4429 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
1. | Bar in Miami's Wynwood files Chapter 11 to halt Russians' fraud lawsuit - South Florida Business Journal (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/11/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 26, 2015 | ||
94 | 94
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 08/26 1:25 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Lebron, Lorraine) |