Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-11752

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:15-bk-11758
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2015
Terminated:Feb 24, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
AG 11, LLC
187 NW 28th St
Miami, FL 33127-4429
Represented By
Nicholas B. Bangos, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130

Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Friday, February 26, 2016
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sat 02/27 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Related [+] Notice Date 02/26/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case (Re:24 ). Dismissal Shall Be with 1 Year Prejudice [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] (Barr, Ida) Modified date on 2/24/2016 .
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
26 26 court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 02/24 12:43 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Dismiss Case Order Wed 02/24 12:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Related [+]. Dismissal Shall Be with 1 Year Prejudice [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-] #24
Thursday, June 04, 2015
24 24 motion Dismiss Case Wed 02/24 12:39 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Interested Party Wynwood Entertainment, LLC , Debtor AG 11, LLC . (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2015
23 23 misc Notice of Apptmt/Non-Apptmt of Creditors Committee Mon 03/09 10:33 AM
Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES)
Related: [-]
22 22 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded [PAPERLESS] Mon 03/09 10:32 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 26, 2015
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/26 3:39 PM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1075 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Howlan, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 06, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/07 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/06/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Case 1:15-bk-11752.
19 19 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Fri 02/06 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nicholas B. Bangos Esq. Related [+]. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
18 18 order Order Setting Hearing Fri 02/06 7:16 AM
Order Setting Final Hearing And Briefing Deadlines on Stay Relief and Remand Motions Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2015 at 02:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 4 (RAM), Miami, FL 33128. (Rodriguez, Olga)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor VMI Entertainment, LLC
Thursday, February 05, 2015
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 02/06 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/6/2015 at 01:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 6/4/2015.
16 16 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 02/05 3:19 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Nicholas B. Bangos Esq. Related [+]. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, February 04, 2015
15 15 order Order (Generic) Wed 02/04 10:29 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Case 1:15-bk-11752. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 03, 2015
14 14 misc Case Management Summary Tue 02/03 1:21 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Tue 02/03 10:57 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/6/2015 at 01:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 6/4/2015. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]
12 12 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 02/03 9:28 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney John R. Dodd Esq. Related [+]. (Dodd, John)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing
Monday, February 02, 2015
11 11 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Mon 02/02 6:48 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Nicholas B. Bangos Esq. Related [+]. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 10 Schedules and/or Statements filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC
10 10 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Mon 02/02 6:47 PM
Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,] Filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Mon 02/02 2:38 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/03/2015 at 03:00 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 4 (RAM), Miami, FL 33128. (Howlan, Elaine)
Related: [-] 8 Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $176] Filed by Creditor VMI Entertainment, LLC.
8 8 motion Relief from Stay Mon 02/02 12:14 PM
Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay [Fee Amount $176] Filed by Creditor VMI Entertainment, LLC. (Dodd, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 02/02 12:22 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay 15-11758 RAM) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23626366. Fee amount 176.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 01, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/02 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/01/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 2/12/2015. Schedule A due 2/12/2015. Schedule B due 2/12/2015. Schedule D due 2/12/2015. Schedule E due 2/12/2015. Schedule F due 2/12/2015. Schedule G due 2/12/2015. Schedule H due 2/12/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/12/2015. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/12/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/12/2015].
Friday, January 30, 2015
6 6 court Notice of Deficiency Fri 01/30 12:31 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 2/12/2015. Schedule A due 2/12/2015. Schedule B due 2/12/2015. Schedule D due 2/12/2015. Schedule E due 2/12/2015. Schedule F due 2/12/2015. Schedule G due 2/12/2015. Schedule H due 2/12/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/12/2015. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/12/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/12/2015]. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 29, 2015
5 5 misc Equity Security Holders Thu 01/29 5:21 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 01/29 5:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Thu 01/29 5:20 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Nicholas B. Bangos Esq. Related [+]. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 01/29 5:19 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor AG 11, LLC. (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Thu 01/29 5:16 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Bangos, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/29 5:17 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11758 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23601791. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]