Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:15-bk-12159
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Mar 23, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jun 08, 2015
Terminated:Oct 21, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Oct 21, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.
2350 NW 149th St
Opa Locka, FL 33054-3132
Represented By
Thomas L Abrams, Esq
contact info
Jacqueline Calderin, Esq.
contact info
Robert P. Charbonneau, Esq.
contact info
Matthew A Petrie
Ehrenstein Charbonneau Calderin
contact info
Allan A Joseph
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Creditor Committee
Represented By
Morgan B. Edelboim, Esq.
contact info
James H Fierberg
contact info
Jeffrey P. Bast, Esq.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Steven D Schneiderman
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, October 28, 2016
1131 1131 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/28 4:41 PM
Notice of Filing Affidavit/Sworn Statement of Estimated Final Disbursements for Fourth Quarter 2016 , Filed by Debtor Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.. (Abrams, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
1130 1130 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 10/24 11:02 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Thomas L Abrams Esq Related [+]. (Abrams, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1126 Order on Application for Compensation, Order on Application for Compensation, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Motion to Approve, Order on Motion to Sell, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Objection to Claims, Order on Motion to Assume/Reject, Order on Miscellaneous Motion, Order on Motion for Turnover of Property, Order on Application for Compensation, Order on Application for Compensation, Order on Application for Compensation, Order on Agreed Motion For Relief From Stay, Order on Motion to Appoint Trustee, Order on Motion For Relief From Stay
Sunday, October 23, 2016
1129 1129 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/24 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1127 Final Decree .
Friday, October 21, 2016
1128 1128 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 10/21 9:36 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]
1127 1127 order Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11] Fri 10/21 9:31 AM
Final Decree . (Barr, Ida)
Related: [-]