Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12159

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:15-ap-01560
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2015
Terminated:Nov 25, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
Miami-Dade County
Represented By
Miami-Dade County
contact info
Plaintiff
Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.
501 Brickell Key Dr #300
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Robert P. Charbonneau, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, November 25, 2015
8 8 court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/25 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1560 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Thu 09/10 2:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
6 6 misc Report of Mediator Wed 09/09 12:18 PM
Report of Mediator Filed by Mediator Paul L. Orshan. (Orshan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Fri 08/21 3:43 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Composite Exhibit "C" , Filed by Plaintiff Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc. Related [+].(Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 15-01560 Complaint by Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc. against Miami-Dade County. Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) filed by Plaintiff Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, August 18, 2015
4 4 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 08/18 4:39 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. Related [+]. (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Monday, August 17, 2015
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Mon 08/17 10:40 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/17 10:39 AM
Summons Issued on Miami-Dade County Answer Due 9/16/2015 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/10/2015 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc.
Friday, August 14, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/14 5:14 PM
Adversary case 15-01560 Complaint by Ecological Paper Recycling, Inc. against Miami-Dade County. Nature of Suit:,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D