RS Legacy Corporation
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-10197 |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 18, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 10, 2015 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 02, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | More than $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
RadioShack Corporation
300 RadioShack Circle
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RadioShack Corporation, et al.
300 Radioshack Cir
Fort Worth, TX 76102-1901 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
RS Legacy Corporation, et al.
300 Radioshack Cir
Fort Worth, TX 76102-1901 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 28, 2015 12:46 PM EDT |
Attorney
Cooley LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Attorney
Frost Brown Todd LLC
3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth St.
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Hiller & Arban, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Huntsville Commons, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Jones Day
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
LSH Colorado Investments, LLC
Mulliken Weiner Berg & Jolivet P.C. 102 South Tejon Street Suite 900
Colorado Springs, CO 80903 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111 |
|
Attorney
Kevin M. Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
|
Attorney
Pepper Hamilton LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010 |
|
Attorney
Ruby Rental Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Titusville/SAV, LLC and Hinesville Central/SAV
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
The Renaissance Centre 405 N. King Street, Suite 500
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
|
Represented By
|
Consumer Privacy Ombudsman
Elise Frejka
Frejka PLLC 733 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aransas County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
118 Court Street, LLC
118 Court Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
1204 Corporation
6315 Forbes Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15217 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
150 E 42 REALTY LLC AND AM 150 E 42 REALTY LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
1565 Broadway LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
1802 Ridge Pike Associates, L.P.
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
204th Street Partners LLC
26 Broadway, 17th Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
224 Seventh Avenue Realty LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
224 West 57 Street LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
2505 Broadway Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
2561 Broadway LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
278 Main Street Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
2810 Broadway LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Certilman Balin 349-351 WFP Shirley, LLC
90 Merrick Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
3520-52 Johnson LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
3D Robotics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
420 Lincoln Road Associates, Ltd.
913 North Market Street 10th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
4357 S. Franklin Street, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
457 Fulton St. LLC and 1565 Broadway LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
505 Cordova, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
5060 Montclair Plaza Owner, LLC
1875 Century Park East Suite 1860
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
52nd Street Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
64 Southampton LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
69th Leasing LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
69th Street Retail Owner LP, J&I Realty Associates LLC, Maryland Crossing Realty LLC, Fluency, LLC, Cross Bronx Plaza LLC, 949-959 Southern Boulevard LLC and Sunny Isle Developers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
711 Hope LP dba 3424 Wilshire LLC
1007 N. Sepulveda Blvd., #1237
Manhattan Beach, CA 90267 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
732 East Vista Way, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
777 Tamalpais Drive, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
80 PINE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
A.J. Richard & Son, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ACF Lakewood 11, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ACF Property Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ADLP-U&A, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AGC West Town Center Owner LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AMREIT PRESTON ROYAL NEC LP
ROSS, BANKS, MAY, CRON & CAVIN, pc 2 Riverway, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ARD Grant, L.P.
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AT&T Corp. and its affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AT&T Mobility, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Acadia Realty Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Committee of U.S. Dealers and Franchisees
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Adobe Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
AlShak Realty, LLC
Stark & Stark, PC PO Box 510 203 W. 18th Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Albany Road-Springfield Plaza
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Albemarle Crossing, LLC; Applewood Shopping Center, GP; Howell Family Properties, LLC; Darlington SC, LLC; Soutstar Holdings-Rock Hill, LLC; Zenith Investment Grantor trust by its trustee, Summit DE
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richard Albright
# LD2583 301 Institution Drive
Bellefonte, PA 16823 |
|
Creditor
Alecta Real Estate USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alejo/Alvarez Investment, Inc.
913 North Market Street 10th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AlixPartners LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alpha Wireless Inc.
733 W. Michigan Ave
Saline, MI 48176 |
|
Creditor
American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Electric Power; Baltimore Gas and Electric Company; Central Maine Power Company; Commonwealth Edison Company); The Connecticut Light and Power Company);
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Resurgens Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anderson County, et. al.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Angelina County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arapahoe County Treasurer
5334 S. Prince Street
Littleton, CO 80166 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arapahoe Village Holdings, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arlington ISD, Eagle Mountain-Saginaw ISD,City of Azle, Carroll ISD, Crowley ISD, Mansfield ISD, City of Benbrook, Johnson County et al, Ennis ISD, Richardson ISD
Perdue Brandon Fielder et al 500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Assurant Service Protection, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Austin Property Group, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Austintown Plaza, Ltd.
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Autodesk, Inc.
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP 1999 Harrison St. 25th Floor
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aviation Mall NewCo, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BBDO Puerto Rico, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BC Wood Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BCP Fayette Square, LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BNOLLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Baker & McKenzie LLP
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300
Dallas, TX 75201 |
|
Creditor
Barrett Crossing Shopping Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Basser-Kaufman, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bay Area Shops, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bay Park Venture I, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bayshore Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Doug Belden
Hillsborough County Tax Collector c/o Brian T. FitzGerald, Esquire Hillsborough County Attorney's Office P.O. Box 1110
Tampa, FL 33601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Belton Shack, LLC (Store #16691)
605 W 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MO 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Benderson Development Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beverly Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bexar County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bird 107 Partners, Ltd. n/k/a Bird 107 Partners, Ltd., LLLP
10613 Bird Road
Miami, FL 33165 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bloomfield 2005, LLC (Store 16485)
605 W 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MO 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bloomfield 2005, LLC (Store 18571)
605 W 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MO 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blumenfeld Development Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Antonio Boatner, Jr.
3191 West 7th Street #428
Los Angeles, CA 90005 |
|
Creditor
Boscacci Group, LLC
P.O. Box 1637
Lafayette, CA 94549 |
|
Creditor
Boston & Mays LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boulder at Nellis, LLC
Ervin Cohen & Jessup LLP 9401 Wilshire Blvd., 9th Floor
Beverly Hills, CA 90212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Breckenridge 2005 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CAPREF Lloyd Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CAPREF Lloyd Center LLC, CAPREF Brookwood Village LLC, and Eastgate Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CBNJ, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CC Investment Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRESOF Hartsville Loan, LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CWCapital Asset Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CambridgeSide Galleria Trust Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cameron County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joseph T. Camisa
221 Sansome Street Third Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Madeline L. Camisa
221 Sansome Street Third Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cape Town Plaza LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Capital Group MDI, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carlyle ER Metro LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carriage Place
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carrollton Central Plaza Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cassidy Turley Commercial Real Estate Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cedar Realty Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cedar-Carmans, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cencor Property Management
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cencor Realty Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Centennial Real Estate Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CenterCal Properties, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Certain Texas Taxing Entities
1235 North Loop West Suite 600
Houston, TX 77008 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Champlain Centre North, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chase Properties Retail Acquisition Fund I, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Citibank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of El Paso
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Fort Worth
1000 Throckmorton
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Harlingen
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of McAllen
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Philadelphia
Law Revenue Bureau Municipal Services Building 1401 John F. Kennedy Blvd 5th floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Raymondville
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Thomasville, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Wichita Falls, Wichita Falls Independent School District and Wichita County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clear Creek Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Collin County Tax Assessor-Collector et al.
DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC 1255 West 15th Street Suite 805
Plano, TX 75075 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Colt Holdings, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commack S.C. Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commons Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of PA Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Diane S. Connell
|
|
Creditor
Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.; The Dominion East Ohio Gas Company; Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC; Duke Energy Florida, Inc.; Duke Energy Indiana, Inc.;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
County of Kern, State of California
Attn: Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 579
Bakersfield, CA 93302 |
|
Creditor
Cranberry Township
2525 Rochester Rd, Suite 400
Cranberry Township, PA 16066 |
|
Creditor
Cranston/BVT Associates, LP
300 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crossgates Mall General Company NewCo, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crystal Run NewCo, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DLC Management Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DLC Management Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dakotaland Federal Credit Union
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Danpar Associates Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dayton Town & Country
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
De Rito Pavilions 139, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deeal, LLC (fka Klein & Assoc.)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Delco Development Company of Port Washington, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deutsche Asset & Wealth Management
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deville-THF Massillon Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Direct Energy Business LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Diversified Realty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donahue Schriber Asset Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donahue Schriber Realty Group, L.P.
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Donaldsons Crossroads Associates
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC 525 WIlliam Penn Place 28th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dudrow Torrington, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Duke Energy Kentucky, Inc.; Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.; Duke Energy Progress, Inc.; Florida Power & Light Company; Georgia Power Company; Hope Gas, Inc., d/b/a Dominion Hope;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dun & Bradstreet (D&B)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Duquesne Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
E&A Northeast Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
E&P Myrtle Avenue Corp.
1311 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19806 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
EQYInvest Owner II, Ltd., LLP
Rashti and Mitchell 4422 Ridgeside Drive
Dallas, TX 75244 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ETC Dime, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
East Cobb Crossing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eastgate Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eight Eagles, LLC
Registered Service Agent 1507 N. Shawnee
Shawnee, OK 74804 |
|
Creditor
EklecCo NewCo LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elaine M. Scuderi and Belmont Gardens Management Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elkhorn Plaza Shopping Center, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Elsinore Developers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Engel Realty Company
Sirote & Permutt, P.C. 2311 Highland Avenue S.
Birmingham, AL 35205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Entergy Arkansas, Inc., Entergy Gulf States Louisiana, L.L.C., Entergy Louisiana, LLC, Entergy Mississippi, Inc., Entergy New Orleans, Inc. and Entergy Texas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Equity One LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Essex Gas Company; KeySpan Gas East Corporation; Massachusetts Electric Company; Narragansett Electric Company; Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Experian Marketing Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
FMP Colonie LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
FREP III - Springdale Shopping Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Fairview Shopping Center, L.L.C.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fayette Square Associates, LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Warranty Service Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Festival Pasadena Associates, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fiji Electronics & Schenzhen Chousen Optoelectronic (Hong Kong)
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Folsom Central Holdings, LLC
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2560
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend CountyMUD #26
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Foursquare Properties, Inc.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Franklin ISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fresh Pond Mall Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GEM Realty Capital, Inc.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate 110 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GRB Ontario Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GSD&M Idea City, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garstat, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garten One MW, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Garten One, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gates Circle LLC
Rutan & Tucker, LLP 611 Anton Blvd., Ste. 1400
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gentilly, LLC
4040 Broadway, Suite 450
San Antonio, TX 78209 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Georgia Department of Revenue
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
William A. Gerhart
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gibraltar Management Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Linda Gindi
Landlord - Radio Shack Store No. 2643 1010 Flatbush Realty LLC c/o 3G Imports 131 8th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11215 |
|
Creditor
Gladstone Corners, LLC
901 N. Market St., Suite 1300
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gold Coast Partners, llc
PO Box 11648
Atlanta, GA 30355 |
|
Creditor
Goodrich Hazlet L.L.C.
560 Sylvan Avenue Suite 2100
Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632 |
|
Creditor
Greece Ridge, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Green Valley Marketplace, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Greensboro Property Company, LLC (Store 8505)
605 W 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MO 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gregory Greenfield & Associates, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Grovelake SC Company, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
H. Levenbaum Realty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HA LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HA LP and Pikesville Leasehold, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HS Investors LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HSG One MW, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HSG Pasadena, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harlingen CISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harold Cohen and Martin E. Cohen, Trustees of Fitchtex Realty Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hartford Corners 1 and 2 Corporation
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hays CISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Henrico County, Virginia
County Attorney P.O. Box 90775
Henrico, VA 23273 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hewlett-Packard Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hidalgo County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Highland Development Properties
13116 Imperial Highway
Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 |
|
Creditor
Holyoke Mall Company, L.P.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hudson Plaza Development LLC
POB 1387
Fayetteville, GA 30214 |
|
Creditor
Huffman Mill Plaza Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Marilyn Hutchinson
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hybris (U.S.) Corporation
Baker & Hostetler LLP 45 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10111 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
IA Management, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IProspect.com
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Imperial County Treasurer - Tax Collector
940 West Main Street Suite 106
El Centro, CA 92243 |
|
Creditor
In Towne Shopping Centeres Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Independence Center, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Indian Springs Investors II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Inland Commercial Property Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Inland National Real Estate Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Inland TRS Property Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Intelligrated Products, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Business Machines (IBM)
|
|
Creditor
Ironbound Urban Renewal Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
J&I Realty Associates LLC, Maryland Crossing Realty LLC, Fluency, LLC, and Sunny Isle Developers LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JK Imaging, LTD.
913 North Market Street 10th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JMH Associates LLC
Green & Levine LLP Tamara Kagan Levine, Esq. 231 Farmington Avenue
Farmington, CT 06032 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JPMG Manassas Mall Owner LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
|
Creditor
James S. Billups III 1996 Trust #1
4040 Broadway, Suite 450 c/o Kingman Law
San Antonio, TX 78209 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jim Wells CAD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Johnson River Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Baker L. Jones
Store 01-9331 1834 Lyons Bend Road
Knoxville, TN 37919 |
|
Creditor
Jones Lang LaSalle Americas Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.
|
|
Creditor
Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., as Receiver for the property commonly known as East Town Mall
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jubilee Square, LLC
McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, LLC PO Box 350
Mobile, AL 36601 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Juster Properties
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRE Colonie Owner LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Beechwood, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Bolton Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Cool Creek Outlots, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Dallas Wheatland, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Draper Peaks, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Hunters Creek, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Las Vegas Centennial Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Las Vegas Eastern Beltway, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Management, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Merrimack Village, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Pine Ridge, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Port St. Lucie Landing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG St. Cloud 13th, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Temple Terrace, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG/PRP Oldsmar, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KaElie LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kimco Realty Corporation
3333 New Hyde Park Road Suite 100
New Hyde Park, NY 11042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kleberg County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kroger Limited Partnership I and Dillon Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LM One MW, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LM Pasadena, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
LSH Colorado Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
La Habra Associates
1900 Avenue of the Stars 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lake Community Bank
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lake Jackson Shopping Center, Ltd.
Jay Foster 1800 August Suite 370
Houston, TX 77057 |
|
Creditor
Lake Success Shopping Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Amber Lambert
# 181498 P.O. Box 88550
Pearl, MS 39288 |
|
Creditor
Land Equities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lanesborough Enterprises Newco, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Larken & Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lawrence Friedland and The Estate of Melvin Friedland
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lessor Gofis Brother's Realty Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levcom Wall Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levin Properties, L.P.
Stark & Stark, PC PO Box 510 203 W. 18th Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levy/Aug Bayonne LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levy/Aug Bayonne, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lexington NC (Lexington) SRX, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lilac Mall Associates, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Limestone County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lindell Market Place, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trisha Lindsey
#121381 P.O. Box 88550
Pearl, MS 39288 |
|
Creditor
Little Creek Investment Corporation
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Livingston/Pineborough Interests, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Llano County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lockhaven Zamagias, LP
Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, LLC 525 William Penn Place 28th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lucas Claremont Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
M&I Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MEC Lenox Associates Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MLO Great South Bay LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MP Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MagicJack LP
Akerman, LLP 350 East Las Olas Blvd. Suite 1600
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Main Street NA Parkade, Inc.
300 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Louis Malek
# 114043 USP P.O. Box 250 14425 S. Bitterbrush Ln.
Draper, UT 84020 |
|
Creditor
Malon D. Mimms Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maricopa County Treasurer
222 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1100
Phoenix, AZ 85004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maxxtoona Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mayo Family LLC
Nadler Nadler & Burdman Co., LPA 6550 Seville Drive Suite B
Canfield, OH 44406 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
McKinley Mall LLC and Townview Retail LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stephen J. McKolay
1377 S. Airport Rd. W.
Traverse City, MI 49686 |
|
Creditor
McLennan County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Medford Equities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MerchSource LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Microsoft Corporation and Microsoft Licensing, GP
Riddell Williams P.S. 1001 - 4th Avenue Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Middletown UE LLC
1311 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19806 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Miller Realty Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Miller Square, LLC
700 Walnut, Suite 1600
Des Moines, IA 50309 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Moonlite Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morris Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Motorola Mobility LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mt. Airy Shopping Center, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Muddy Branch Square Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NStar Electric & Gas Corporation; New York State Electric and Gas Corporation; Oklahoma Gas & Electric; Orlando Utilities Commission; Orange and Rockland Utilities, Inc.;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Realty & Development Corp.
3 Manhattanville Road
Purchase, NY 10577 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Shopping Plazas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nelson's Corner Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Paltz Properties, L.P.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Westgate Mall, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Niagara Station, LLC
Tenenbaum & Saas, P.C. c/o Bradshaw Rost, Esq. 4504 Walsh Street, Suite 200
Chevy Chase, MD 20815 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Norco Corona Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
North Riverside Park Mall Associates LLC, Causeway LLC a/a/f Lakeside Corporation, Carrolton Plaza Associates and CP Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Northgate Limited Liability Company
201 S. Jackson St.
Tullahoma, TN 37388 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Northgate Partners, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nueces County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OCW Retail-Belmont, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OCW Retail-Dedham, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ocala SC Company, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S Kerr Ave Rm 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
One Mile West, LLLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
One South Wacker Financial Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Nemer PC c/o Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Orange County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Overlea, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oxford Market Place Associates, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PCK Development Company, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PMI NewCo, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
700 Walnut, Suite 1600
Des Moines, IA 50309 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PRSC Holdings (EDENS), LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pacific Gas & Electric Company ("PG&E")
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paragon Management Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Park Central Crossing Outlot 2, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Park Plaza Properties-Mavco, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Park Tysen Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Parkchester Preservation Company, L.P.
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Patterson Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pelham Realty Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ellen Pepper
3575 N Maple Av Ste 62
Zanesville, OH 43701 |
|
Creditor
Peter P. Bollinger Investment Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
William Petropoulos
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Philips International
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phillips Edison & Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pierce Partners
1114 State Street, Suite 213
Santa Barbara, CA 93101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pilgrim Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pinellas County Tax Collector
Pinellas County Tax Collector PO Box 4006
Seminole, FL 33775 |
|
Creditor
Pinewood Palm Beach Retail, LLC
700 Walnut, Suite 1600
Des Moines, IA 50309 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Plainfield Parkade, Inc.
300 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Plantronics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Plaza Las Americas, Inc.
Suite 2000, One Atlantic Center Attn: James H. Rollins 1201 West Peachtree St.
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Plaza del Caribe, S.E.
Suite 2000, One Atlantic Center Attn: James H. Rollins 1201 West Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pliskin Realty and Development, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Susan Mae Polk
P.O. Box 6000
Corona, CA 91720 |
|
Creditor
Polk County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Poughkeepsie Galleria LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Principal Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prudential Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Putnam Parkade Inc.
300 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Putnam Place, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Putnam Plaza II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Putnam Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pyramid Mall of Hadley NewCo, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pyramid Mall of Ithaca, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pyramid Management Group, LLC,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pyramid Walden Company, L.P.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
R & H Mission Gorge Ltd
1620 Fifth Avenue, Suite 770
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
R/M Vacaville, Ltd., L.P.
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
RCG-Miamisburg, LLC
3060 Peachtree Road NW Suite 400
Atlanta, GA 30305 |
|
Creditor
ROIC Paramount Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ROIC Pinole Vista, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ROIC Washington, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RPAI North Richland Hills Davis Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RPAI Pacific Property Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RPAI Southwest Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RPAI US Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Radiant Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rash Peru S.A.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Raymondville ISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Red Mountain Asset Fund I, LLC
Ervin Cohen & Jessup LLP 9401 Wilshire Blvd., 9th Floor
Beverly Hills, CA 90212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
RedBarry Advance, LLC (Store 1582502)
605 W 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MI 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Redman Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Reef Real Estate Services, Inc., on behalf of R&H Mission Gorge Ltd. as successor to R & H Investments and Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regency Centers Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rensselaer County Plaza Associates, LP
Whittington & Aulgur 651 North Broad Street Suite 206
Middletown, DE 19709 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Retail Management Services Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Retail Properties of America, Inc.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richard E. Kaplan and David E. Kaplan, as Trustees of Port Plaza Realty Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rio Grande City CISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RioCan America Management, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
River Landing Joint Venture, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Riverbrook Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rivercrest Realty Associates, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Riveria Shopping Center, LTD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Riverside Claims LLC
P O Box 626 Planetarium Station
New York, NY 10024 |
|
Creditor
Riverwood Investments of Jacksonville, LLC
Wilcox Law Firm 814 A1A N., #202
Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Robert F. Gordon, et al., as Trustees to the Vickerry Realty Co. Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Leonard Roberts
Bruce W. Akerly Cantey Hanger LLP 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 3300
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Robertson County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rochester Gas & Electric Corporation; Salt River Project; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Southern California Edison Company; Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rockland Electric Company; PECO Energy Company; Piedmont Natural Gas Company; Public Service Company of New Hampshire; Public Service Electric and Gas Company;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roosevelt Square L.L.P.
Dewberry Capital Corporation 1545 Peachtree Street, Suite 250
Atlanta, GA 30309 |
|
Creditor
Roslindale Realty Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rouse Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rush Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rykoff Exemption Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SBK Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SCGII - Stonecrest, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SDI Bossier, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SFG Pasadena, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SHAVEMORE, LP
2 Riverway, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77057 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
SK Drive LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SK Drive Properties, LLC; Beverly Plaza, LLC; MEC Fitchburg Associates Limited Partnership; Cape Town Plaza, LLC; MEC Lenox Associates Limited Partnership; CambridgeSide Galleria Associates Trust; VCG
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SLO Promenade DE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Salmon Run Shopping Center, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Marcos CISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Patricio County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SanDisk Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sangertown Square, L.L.C.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Saul Holdings Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Saul Subsidiary I Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tom Sax
R. Sax Inc. 1040 West Main
Mascoutah, IL 62258 |
|
Creditor
Scottsdale Towne Center, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Searstown Partners
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Searstown Partners, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Seayco-THF Conway Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Seayco-THF Market Shops, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sedrak Partners Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Selden Plaza LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Severna Park Marketplace LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shanri Holdings Corp./The Pelican Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shapell SoCal Rental Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shrewsbury Commons Limited Partnership c/o Chesapeake Commercial Properties, Inc.
Attn Josh Bradley 25 South Charles Street 21st Floor
Baltimore, MD 21201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC
19772 MacArthur Blvd. # 200
Irvine, CA 92612 |
|
Creditor
Silver Shield, LLC (Store 18516)
605 W 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MO 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Manoj P. Singh
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Skye-Hilshire, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Slate Trails Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Smart & Final Stores LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jim R Smith
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jeffrey Snyder
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Lake Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Plaza Center Associates, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Towne Properties
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southgate Plaza, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Southgate Retail Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spirit MT Topeka KS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sprint Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
St. Thomas Joint Venture, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Staltac Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starr County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Rhode Island Division of Taxation
|
|
Creditor
Steadfast Companies
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Styertowne Shopping Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sunbelt Investment Holdings
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sunbury Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sureway, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TCCI Broad Street LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TDC South Loop, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TGS Governor's Plaza WM
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF Belleville Development, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF Glen Carbon Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF Kendig Development, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF Paducah Development, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF-D Charleston Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF-L Moline Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
THF/MRP Tiger Town, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKG El Con Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKG Lincoln Crossing, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKG Southeast Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TKG Van Dorn Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TNP SRT Portfolio II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TRC MM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TSCA-245 Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TVO Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman Landlords
Attn. Andrew S. Conway 200 E. Long Lake Road Suite 300
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Technically Scottish I Ltd, LP
Dallas, TX 75225
|
|
Creditor
Tennessee Department of Commerce and Insurance
Consumer Division c/o Tn Attny. General Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Terramar Retail Centers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Ad Valorem Taxing Jurisdictions
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts and Texas Workforce Commission
Jason Starks P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The County of Tulare, California
Tulare County Tax Collector ATTN: Michael See, Deputy Tax Collector 221 S Mooney Blvd, Room 104-E
Visalia, CA 93291 |
|
Creditor
The Davis Center, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Forbes Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Kempner Corporation
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Khedr Family Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Macerich Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Marion Plaza, Inc. d/b/a Eastwood Mall; Governor's Square Company, d/b/a Governor's Square Mall; Huntington Mall Company; Kentucky Oaks Mall Company; Frenchtown Square Partnership, d/b/a
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Marion Plaza, Inc. dba Eastwood Mall
Cafaro Management Company 2445 Belmont Avenue PO Box 2186
Youngstown, OH 44504 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Marketplace
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The McClatchy Company et al
Felderstein Fitzgerald et al 400 Capitol Mall, Suite 1750
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Morris Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Thomas and Mary Baggot Revocable Trust dtd Sept. 25, 2000
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomaston South Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thousand Oaks Marketplace, LP, Shokrolah Levian Nowalk, LLC, et al., Au Zone Santa Ana, LLC, The Terra Nova Group, LP, WPI-Arcal LLC and Page Plaza, LLC
5950 Canoga Avenue, Suite 605
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thrifty Payless, Inc.
c/o 4 Hutton Centre Drive, #900
Santa Ana, CA 92707 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thru-Way Shopping Center LLC
1355 15th Street
Fort Lee, NJ 07024 |
|
Creditor
Time Equities, Inc.
Sirote & Permutt, P.C. 2311 Highland Avenue S.
Birmingham, AL 35205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Toco Hill, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Towne Centre LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Treeline Partners, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tri-City, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trinity Johnson City, LLC
411 E. Franklin St. Suite 600
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tritell L.L.C.
Att: Jeffrey Hawkinson 1000 2nd Avenue Suite 2950
Seattle, WA 98104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trustees of Boston University
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tuller Square Northpointe, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lisa M. Tullis
# 280307 8966 U.S. Hwy 231 N.
Wetumpka, AL 36092 |
|
Creditor
Tyco Integrated Security LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UB Litchfield, LLC;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UB Midland Park I, LLC;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UB New Providence, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UB Putnam, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UB Somers, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UCR Asset Services
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UP Putnam, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United HealthCare Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Power
|
|
Creditor
United Service Protection, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Urban Retail Properties
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Urstadt Biddle Properties Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
VCG Whitney Field, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vantiv, LLC
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vestar Arizona XI, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Victoria County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Victoria Retail L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vienna Plaza Associates Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vintage Capital Group
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vintage Capital Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WDS Wireless Data Services North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WHLR-Tampa Festival, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
WINSTON-SALEM (OAK SUMMIT) WMC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WKA Fairfax, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WP Glimcher
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WP Realty
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Warwick Mall L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washington State Taxing Agencies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Waste Management National Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Watauga 377 LLC
3710 Rawlins Street Suite 1600
Dallas, TX 75219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Watauga 377, LLC, West 7th Corsicana LLC, TSCA-245 Limited Partnership, and TSCA-253 Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Watt Management Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weingarten Realty Investors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West 7th Corsicana LLC
3710 Rawlins St. Suite 1600
Dallas, TX 75219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Caldwell Plaza, LLC
Trenk, DiPasquale, Della Fera & Sodono 347 Mt. Pleasant Avenue
West Orange, NJ 07052 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Morrison Realty LLC
26 Broadway, 17th Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westar Energy, Inc.; Western Massachusetts Electric Company; Yankee Gas Services Company; Boston Gas Company; The Brooklyn Union Gas Company d/b/a National Grid NY; Colonial Gas Company;
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westfield, LLC and Certain Affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westpointe Plaza LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westwood Financial Corp.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wheeler Real Estate Investment Trust Inc.
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street, Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wheeler Real Estate, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Widewaters Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Widewaters Route 12 II Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Widewaters Webster Square, LLC and Hegedorn Realty Associates, L.P. a Joint Venture d/b/a Hard Road Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Willacy County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Winter Street Condominiums, LLC
Holland & Knight LLP 10 St. James Avenue
Boston, MA 02116 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Woodrow Court, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Timmy P. Wu
518 George Rd
Toms River, NJ 08753 |
|
Creditor
Yakima County Treasurer
Room 115, County Courthouse P.O. Box 22530
Yakima, WA 98907 |
|
Creditor
Zadorian Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Zadorian Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Zapata County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
eBay Enterprise, Inc. f/k/a GSI Commerce Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
hybris (U.S.) Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
iProspect.com, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
1983 Harris Family Trust, EC Cleburne Properties, Ltd., Hamco Realty Hopkinsville, LLC, Hamco Realty Kansas, LLC, Hayco Realty, Ltd., Merge Holdings, LLC, Sentinel Properties, LLC, Westover Eagle Harb
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
3501 Bergenline Realty, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ACHS Management Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AGC West Town Center Owner, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ab Initio Software LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Agree Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Agree Realty Corporation, Agree Limited Partnership and Mount Pleasant Shopping Center, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Apple Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Arris Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Arris Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BMC Group
300 Continental Boulevard Suite 570
El Segundo, CA 90277 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bertuccio Estates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CT Corporation
|
|
Interested Party
Cantor Fitzgerald Securities LLC, as administrative agent and successor-in-interest to General Electric Capital Corporation under the Credit Agreement dated as of December 10, 2013
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Centerville Development Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cerberus Levered Loan Opportunities Fund II, L.P., Cerberus NJ Credit Opportunities Fund, L.P. and Cerberus ASRS Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Chester Springs SC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Citizens Bank, N.A.
7 Times Sq., Ste. 2506 Times Square Tower
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cobb County Community Development Agency
E. Dixie Beggs, CPA P. O. Box 649
Marietta, GA 30061 |
|
Interested Party
Coldwater Portfolio Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cole Schotz P.C.
500 Delaware Avenue Suite 1410
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Office of Attorney General, Bureau of Consumer Protection
21 South 12th Street 2nd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
DJD Partners 10, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dack Carbon Associates, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Digital Stream Technology
|
|
Interested Party
EC Cleburne Properties, Ltd. and Merge Holdings, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
East Marlboro Associates
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Empresas Puertorriquenas de Desarrollo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ernst Family Trust
|
|
Interested Party
First Out ABL Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
G&S Lantier Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Gateway Center Associates
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
General Instrument Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
General Retail Funding LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
General Retail Holdings L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
General Wireless, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Greece Ridge, LLC, The Marketplace, Pittsford Plaza SPE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hamco Realty Hopkinsville, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC, Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC and Tiger Capital Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
IRET Properties
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Farmers New Century Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Diane Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
JWW Family, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
James Campbell Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Landings of Sarasota Florida L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Linton Delray, LLC
31500 Northwestern Hwy Suite 300
Farmington Hills, MI 48334 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Litespeed Master Fund, Ltd. and Affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Little River Limited Liability Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Market Plaza 450, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Richard and Beverly Mercurio
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Merge Holdings, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Metropolitan Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Monongahela Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Mt. Pleasant Shopping Center, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Office Depot de Mexico
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ohio Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Olentangy Plaza 450 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jose Ortega
1547 E. Shell Street
Hammond, IN 46320 |
|
Interested Party
PREIT Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PREIT Services, LLC, BET Investments, LLC and The Robbins Companies
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Parker Bangerter, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pelham 2190 White Plains Road LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pennsylvania Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pennsylvania Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Potomac Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Publix Super Markets, Inc., and Real Sub, LLC
Hogan McDaniel 1311 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19806 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
QKC Maui Owner, LLC
660 Woodward Ave. Ste. 2290
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Quaker Lane Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ramco Jackson Crossing SPE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ramco Spring Meadows, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ramco West Oaks II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ramco-Gershenson Properties, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Regal Forest Holding Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Riverside Claims LLC
PO Box 626 Planetarium Station
New York, NY 10024 |
|
Interested Party
S.J.K. Urban Renewal Associates, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
S.W. East Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SCM Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SFP Pool Five Shopping Centers L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SFP Pool One Shopping Centers L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SFP Pool Six, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SFP Pool Three Shopping Centers L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SFP Pool Two Shopping Centers L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SFP Washington Shopping Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SL Nusbaum Realty Co., agent
500 E. Main Street Ste 1225
Norfolk, VA 23510 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Schostak Brothers & Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Shavemore LP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Solebury Partners, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Southgate Associates, Inc.
One Commerce Center 1201 N. Orange Street, Suite 601
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Southgate Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Southwood Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Standard General L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Standard Wireless Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Stat-Boy Real Estate Corp.
Louis Biancone, Esq. 230 Park Avenue Suite 904
New York, NY 10169 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
State of Texas
Bankruptcy & Collections Division P. O. Box 12548 MC-008
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TPP Ephrata, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Taubman Landlords
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Marketplace of Rochester Hills Parcel B, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Toledo Edison Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States of America on Behalf of the Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Urbancal Oakland Mall, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Urstadt Biddle Properties, Inc., UB Midland Park I, LLC, UP Putnam, LLC, Putnam Place, LLC, Putnam Plaza II, LLC, UB Litchfield, LLC, UB New Providence, LLC and UB Somers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
VNV Associates LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Valley Square Shopping Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
David Verderame (and the certified class)
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Huntsville Commons L Walterboro/SAV LLC and
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Warwick Devco, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Waste Management National Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Allen Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Bluffs Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Penn Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
West Shaw Partners, LLC
205 E. River Park Circle, Suite 410
Fresno, CA 93720 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Westover Eagle Harbor, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Whitestone Fountain Hills LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilcut Joint Venture
|
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilson Electronics, LLC, d/b/a weBoost
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wyoming Mall, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
hybrid (U.S.) Corporation
|
|
Liquidating Trustee
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
BENDERSON DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Colette Gibbons
Ice Miller LLP 600 Superior Avenue East Suite 1701
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Infor (US), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
KPMG LLP
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Loudoun County General District Court
|
|
Other Prof.
Meadowbrook Mall Company
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Salus CLO 2012-1, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Salus Capital Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2313, Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Creditor
Realty Income Properties 14, LLC
Terminated: 03/02/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |