Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH L v. Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10197
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10197
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:15-ap-51490 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/22/2024 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 02/19 10:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-51490 Closed (SJS) |
||
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 02/18 1:42 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/17 6:14 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 12/15 9:59 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Thank $75,000.00 Brought by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. Signed on 12/14/2015 (SJS) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/14 6:01 PM
Certificate of Service re: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 16, 2015 at 11:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 12/14 5:37 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 16, 2015 at 11:00 A.M. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Mon 12/14 4:49 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/14 12:16 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Counsel (Multi)
Wed 12/09 8:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Approve - Motion
Fri 11/13 1:28 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/30/2015. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
Wednesday, November 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/11 3:13 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Wed 11/11 11:27 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (McClamb, Chantelle) |
|
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 10/30 9:21 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-51490 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7777880, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 10/29 12:01 PM
Adversary case 15-51490 Complaint by Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the RSH Liquidating Trust against Evergreen Shipping Agency (America) Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 02/26/2016. (Toms, Chad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives |