Family Christian, LLC
Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John T Gregg |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-00643 |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 08, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 09, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2016 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 11, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Family Christian, LLC
5300 Patterson Ave SE
Grand Rapids, MI 49530-1000 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Michelle M. Wilson
Trial Attorney Office of the US Trustee The Ledyard Building, 2nd Floor 125 Ottawa NW, Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Michael V. Maggio
Trial Attorney Office of the US Trustee The Ledyard Building, 2nd Floor 125 Ottawa NW, Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee The Ledyard Building 125 Ottawa Avenue, N.W. Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503 |
1. | Family Christian's Next Chapter: Niche retailer emerges from bankruptcy with plan for modest growth and profitability (mibiz.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/31/2015 | |
2. | Family Christian Stores given new life after bankruptcy judge approves sale (mlive.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/12/2015 | |
3. | Despite big losses, creditors supporting Family Christian Stores bankruptcy sale (mlive.com) |
Submitted Fri 08/07/2015 | |
4. | Family Christian Stores wants creditors to vote on its Chapter 11 bankruptcy plan (mlive.com) |
Submitted Tue 07/07/2015 | |
5. | Family Christian Seeks New Path After Failed Attempt at Redemption (forbes.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/24/2015 | |
6. | Bankruptcy sale of Family Christian Stores scheduled for early June (mlive.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/16/2015 | |
7. | Family Christian Stores Files for Bankruptcy | Gifts & Dec (giftsanddec.com) |
Submitted Mon 02/16/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 12:01 PM EDT |
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
1594 | 1594
court
Close BK Chp 11
Fri 09/02 9:06 AM
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Closed (ljb) |