Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-00643

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John T Gregg
Case #: 1:15-bk-00644
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2015
Terminated:Nov 09, 2015

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
FCS Giftco, LLC
5300 Patterson Ave SE
Grand Rapids, MI 49530-1000
Represented By
A. Todd Almassian
Keller & Almassian PLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Michelle M. Wilson
Trial Attorney Office of the US Trustee The Ledyard Building, 2nd Floor 125 Ottawa NW, Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, November 09, 2015
33 33 court Close BK Chp 11 Mon 11/09 9:35 AM
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Closed (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2015
32 32 order Order (Generic/Motion) Thu 11/05 3:23 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Motion for Order (A) Authorizing Modification of Case Captions and (B) Closing the Bankruptcy Cases of Family Christian Holding, LLC and FCS Giftco, LLC. Signed on 11/5/2015 (lmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
31 31 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 03/04 6:29 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Schedules Wed 03/04 6:28 PM
Schedule(s): Schedules A-H, Summary of Schedules, Declaration Concerning Schedules, Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 19, 2015
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order from Chambers Fri 02/20 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order from Chambers. Notice Date 02/19/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 02/20 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Notice Date 02/19/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Document(Generic) Thu 02/19 3:52 PM
An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Family Christian, LLC (Case No. 15-00643 , Family Christian Holding, LLC (Case No. 15-00642 and FCS Giftco, LLC (Case No. 15-00644 . Family Christian, LLC, Case No. 15-00643 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+]. (bjs)
Related: [-] 26 Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases
26 26 order Order (Generic/Motion) Thu 02/19 1:29 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Related [+]. Lead Case: 15-00643 jtg; Member Cases: 15-00642 jtg and 15-00644 jtg. Signed on 2/19/2015 (kac)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Proposed Joint Administration filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
25 25 notice Declaration Re Electronic Filing Tue 02/17 4:10 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing. (lmj)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Definitive Order Tue 02/17 8:52 AM
Definitive Order. Signed on 2/17/2015 (ml)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Notice of Defective Proposed Order Tue 02/17 8:49 AM
Electronic Notice is hereby given that the proposed order recently filed on the Court's docket,17 , must be electronically uploaded directly into the E-Orders program implemented May 19, 2014. No further action will be taken unless the proposed order is properly uploaded. For assistance, please go to www.miwb.uscourts.gov and select the link for E-Orders Program. (lmj)
Related: [-]
22 22 court Notice of Defective Proposed Order Tue 02/17 8:49 AM
Electronic Notice is hereby given that the proposed order recently filed on the Court's docket,16 , must be electronically uploaded directly into the E-Orders program implemented May 19, 2014. No further action will be taken unless the proposed order is properly uploaded. For assistance, please go to www.miwb.uscourts.gov and select the link for E-Orders Program. (lmj)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Wed 02/18 10:47 AM
Hearing Held. Related [+] Motion Granted - Attorney Almassian to submit order. (kap)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC
Saturday, February 14, 2015
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/15 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/14/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice of Hearing Sun 02/15 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice of Hearing. Notice Date 02/14/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Filings Due Sun 02/15 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Filings Due Notice Date 02/14/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
18 18 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Fri 02/13 4:02 PM
Meeting of Creditors under Chapter 11. Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/11/2015 at 10:00 AM at Office of U.S.Trustee (The Ledyard Building). (Maggio, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 02/13 2:20 PM
Motion To Admit Counsel, Paul M. Rosenblatt, pro hac vice Filed by Interested Party FCS Acquisition, LLC (Franks, William)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 02/13 2:19 PM
Motion To Admit Counsel, Todd C. Meyers, pro hac vice Filed by Interested Party FCS Acquisition, LLC (Franks, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
15 15 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Thu 02/12 6:06 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Interested Party FCS Acquisition, LLC. (Franks, William)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Thu 02/12 4:27 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing Set
Att: 1 Matrix
13 13 court Notice Re: Pleading filed without Proposed Order (JA Use) Thu 02/12 2:05 PM
Electronic Notice is hereby given that the Court is in receipt of your recently filed8 Motion To Admit Counsel, Erich N. Durlacher, pro hac. If you are seeking relief without a hearing, a proposed order must be electronically uploaded directly into the E-Orders program implemented May 19, 2014. No further action will be taken unless a proposed order is properly uploaded. For assistance, please go to www.miwb.uscourts.gov and select the link for E-Orders Program. (lmj)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Notice Re: Pleading filed without Proposed Order (JA Use) Thu 02/12 2:04 PM
Electronic Notice is hereby given that the Court is in receipt of your recently filed7 Motion To Admit Counsel, Brad Baldwin, pro hac vice. If you are seeking relief without a hearing, a proposed order must be electronically uploaded directly into the E-Orders program implemented May 19, 2014. No further action will be taken unless a proposed order is properly uploaded. For assistance, please go to www.miwb.uscourts.gov and select the link for E-Orders Program. (lmj)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Hearing Set (Generic BK) Thu 02/12 11:16 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 2/17/2015 at 09:00 AM Judge Gregg Courtroom (Courtroom C). Notice returned to Attorney A. Todd Almassian for service. (kd)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC
10 10 order Reassigning Judge (Sua Sponte) Thu 02/12 11:04 AM
Sua Sponte Order Reassigning Bankruptcy Proceedings to the Honorable John T. Gregg. Involvement of Scott W. Dales Terminated. John T. Gregg Added. Signed on 2/12/2015 (lmj)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Joint Administration Thu 02/12 9:54 AM
Corrected Notice of Proposed Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases: 15-00642 15-00643 15-00644 Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.). Modified on 2/12/2015 (bjs)
Related: [-]
appr Notice of Appearance by United States Trustee Thu 02/12 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Michael V. Maggio. (5Maggio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
8 8 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 02/11 8:54 PM
Motion To Admit Counsel, Erich N. Durlacher, pro hac vice Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 02/11 8:53 PM
Motion To Admit Counsel, Brad Baldwin, pro hac vice Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
6 6 motion Joint Administration Wed 02/11 8:24 PM
*See9 for correction* Notice of Proposed Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases: 15-00642 15-00643 15-00644 Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.). Modified on 2/12/2015 (bjs)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Resolution Wed 02/11 6:54 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Verification of Matrix Wed 02/11 6:54 PM
Verification of Matrix Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 02/11 6:53 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 02/11 6:52 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor FCS Giftco, LLC (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 02/11 6:50 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by FCS Giftco, LLC Schedules A-J due 02/25/2015. Summary of schedules due 02/25/2015. Declaration of Schedules due 02/25/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/25/2015. (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 02/11 6:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-00644 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 11152751, amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
appr Notice of Appearance by United States Trustee Wed 02/11 6:57 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. Trustee Michelle M. Wilson. (Wilson, Michelle)
Related: [-]
court Notice To File Declaration Re: ECF (ADI) Wed 02/11 11:58 PM
Electronic Notice to Debtor(s) Counsel to File Conventionally with the Court Debtor(s) Declaration Re: ECF Within Seven Days from the Date of Filing or Case will be Dismissed Without Prejudice Pursuant to ECF Guidelines. To obtain a copy of this form, please go to: http://www.miwb.uscourts.gov/forms/declaration-re-electronic-filing (ADI)
Related: [-]