University General Hospital, LP and Accountable Healthcare Staffing, Inc. DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly Admninistered under Case 15-31086-H3-11. This message does not apply to adversary proceedings or claims registers.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:15-bk-31086
Lead case is: 4:15-bk-31086
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:15-bk-31097 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2021 |
Type | Partnership |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Saturday, January 30, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 01/30 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/30/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
Final Decree (No Form)
Thu 01/28 3:03 PM
Order (I)(A) Authorizing Final Distributions to Holders of Allowed General Unsecured Claims and Approving Final Accounting and (B) Entering Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases and Approving Dissolution of the Liquidating Trust; and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 1/28/2021 (emiller) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Tue 11/24 3:25 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 34 (Harris, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Withdraw Document
Tue 06/20 12:37 PM
Withdraw Document (Filed By Accountable Healthcare Staffing, Inc. ) (Ellison, Marc) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/06 1:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/06 1:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, January 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Sun 01/01 6:30 AM
|
|
Saturday, December 31, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
court
Notice of Transfer Under General Order 2017-1 (batch) (form)
Sat 12/31 11:21 AM
Notice of Transfer Under General Order 2017-1. This case has been transferred from Judge Letitia Z. Paul to Judge David R Jones . All court settings remain in force. (rwes) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/23 3:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ellen Maresh Hickman (Hickman, Ellen) |
||
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Tue 08/11 11:09 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 43 |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Amended Petition (Attorney Use)
Fri 05/15 3:56 PM
Amended Petition Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filed By University General Hospital, LP ). (Higgins, John) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 03/07 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/06 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 03/04 4:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Misty A Segura Filed by on behalf of Management Affiliates of Northeast Houston, LLC (Segura, Misty) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Generic Order
Wed 03/04 8:12 AM
Order Signed on 3/3/2015. This case is transferred from Judge Karen K. Brown to Judge Letitia Z. Paul. (jdav) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Generic Order (Matrix)
Tue 03/03 4:06 PM
Copy of Order for Joint Administration Signed on 3/2/2015. (Copy only, original entered in Case No. 15-31086 ) (than) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/02 5:16 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Damon J Chargois Filed by on behalf of Reilly Medical Systems, LLC (Chargois, Damon) |
|
4 | 4
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Mon 03/02 8:09 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (mmap) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 03/03 5:44 PM
Judge Letitia Z. Paul added to case. Involvement of Judge Karen K. Brown Terminated (than) |
||
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Fri 02/27 6:30 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor University General Hospital, LP (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Fri 02/27 12:45 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Corporate Ownership Statement of University General Hospital, LP (Filed By University General Hospital, LP ) (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Fri 02/27 10:37 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717. Filed by University General Hospital, LP. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/30/2015 (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |