100M Midtown, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-14075 |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2016 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 18, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
100M Midtown, LLC
1201 Brickell Ave Ste 210
Miami, FL 33131-4028 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/27/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/25 12:46 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
38 | 38
![]() Final Decree Nunc Pro Tunc to December 3, 2015 . (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Order Granting Motion to Deconsolidate the Cases and Designate a New LEAD Case. The Reorganized Debtors NEW Lead Case will be 100M WEST KENDALL LLC, Case No. 15-14079 BKC-AJC. [Docketed as ECF #521 in 15-14066 AJC]. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
36 | 36
![]() Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order (I) Directing the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to Administratively Close the Dissolved Debtors (as Defined Herein) and Enter a Final Decree. [DOCKETED AS ECF #520 IN 15-14066 AJC] . (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2015 to November 4, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Order (I) Granting Final Approval of First Amended Joint Disclosure Statement In Connection With First Joint Plan of Reorganization for the Debtors; and (II) Confirming First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan. Paul J. Battista, Esq Named as Disbursing Agent. Post-Confirmation Status hearing to be held on 01/28/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Friday, August 21, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of March 4, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
Thursday, April 02, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Notice of Compliance Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC . (Battista, Paul) |
|
25 | 25
utility
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF]
Thu 04/02 9:01 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry; specifically, Local Form 4 was not provided. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE REQUIRED LOCAL FORM 4 AND LINK TO DE#22. (Adam, Lorraine) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq . (Battista, Paul) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq. (Battista, Paul) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule B,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,] Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Battista, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 4/1/2015. . (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/13/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/12/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 03/11/2015. (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/11/2015. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC . (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015. (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14075 AJC (Covington, Katrinka) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC . (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 BKC-AJC; 15-14086 BKC-AJC into Lead Case 15-14087 BKC-AJC Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Laurel M Isicoff Removed from Case. (Rios, Amber) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order of Reassignment. Involvement of Laurel M Isicoff Terminated. Judge A. Jay Cristol Added to Case . (Rios, Amber) |
|
9 | 9
court
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Mon 03/09 12:29 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Saturday, March 07, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/07/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Ex-Parte Motion by Chapter 11 Debtor to Transfer Bankruptcy Cases to Judge A. Jay Cristol Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC . (Rios, Amber) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015]. (Rios, Amber) |
|
5 | 5
![]() **INCORRECT EVENT USED, SEE DE #7**Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division Judge A. Jay Cristol Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) Modified on 3/5/2015 (Rios, Amber) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 03/18/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq . (Battista, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor 100M Midtown, LLC. (Battista, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Battista, Paul) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 03/04 6:29 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-14075 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23908039. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |