Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-bk-14066
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Apr 06, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jul 06, 2015
Terminated:Oct 25, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Nov 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
100M Waterford LLC
1201 Brickell Ave Ste 210
Miami, FL 33131-4028
Represented By
Mariaelena Gayo-Guitian
contact info
Michael L Schuster
contact info
Paul J. Battista, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
creditors committee
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Johanna Armengol
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Thursday, October 27, 2016
525 525 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/28 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/27/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 523 Final Decree Nunc Pro Tunc to December 3, 2015 .
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
524 524 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 10/25 12:18 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
523 523 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 12:17 PM
Final Decree Nunc Pro Tunc to December 3, 2015 . (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
522 522 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/25 10:59 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M Waterford LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 520 Order on Miscellaneous Motion,521 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
Monday, October 24, 2016
521 521 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Mon 10/24 4:48 PM
Order Granting Motion to Deconsolidate the Cases and Designate a New LEAD Case Related [+]. The Reorganized Debtors new Lead Case will be 100M WEST KENDALL LLC, Case No. 15-14079 BKC-AJC. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-] #511
520 520 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Mon 10/24 4:46 PM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order (I) Directing the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to Administratively Close the Dissolved Debtors (as Defined Herein) and Enter a Final Decree Related [+] (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-] #511