Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-bk-14078
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2015
Terminated:Oct 25, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Nov 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
100M Arlington, LLC
1201 Brickell Ave Ste 210
Miami, FL 33131-4028
Represented By
Paul J. Battista, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 53 seconds ago
Thursday, October 27, 2016
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 10/28 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 10/27/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Final Decree Nunc Pro Tunc to December 3, 2015 .
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
40 40 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 10/25 12:53 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 12:52 PM
Final Decree Nunc Pro Tunc to December 3, 2015 . (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
38 38 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 10:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Deconsolidate the Cases and Designate a New LEAD Case. The Reorganized Debtors NEW Lead Case will be 100M WEST KENDALL LLC, Case No. 15-14079 BKC-AJC. [Docketed as ECF #521 in 15-14066 AJC]. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order (I) Directing the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to Administratively Close the Dissolved Debtors (as Defined Herein) and Enter a Final Decree. [DOCKETED AS ECF #520 IN 15-14066 AJC] . (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
36 36 utility Utility - Update Claims Register Tue 11/24 11:17 AM
Updated Claims Register, Per DE#419 in main Case no 15-14066 Order Sustaining Second Omnibus Objection to Claim No.3-1 (Priority Claims). (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2015
35 35 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 11/23 1:15 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2015 to November 4, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
34 34 order Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 11/18 6:10 PM
Order (I) Granting Final Approval of First Amended Joint Disclosure Statement In Connection With First Joint Plan of Reorganization for the Debtors; and (II) Confirming First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan. Paul J. Battista, Esq Named as Disbursing Agent. Post-Confirmation Status hearing to be held on 01/28/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
33 33 misc Debtor in Possession Report Thu 10/22 2:03 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
32 32 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 09/21 2:29 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
31 31 misc Debtor in Possession Report Fri 08/21 10:38 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
30 30 misc Debtor in Possession Report Tue 07/21 10:19 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2015
29 29 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 06/22 3:53 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (Amended) Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 06/22 2:02 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2015 to May 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena) Modified on 6/22/2015 - minor text edit (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2015
27 27 misc Debtor in Possession Report Wed 05/20 5:31 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
26 26 misc Debtor in Possession Report Tue 04/21 4:51 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of March 4, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2015
25 25 misc Notice of Compliance/Non-Compliance Thu 04/02 10:43 AM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 21 Schedules and Statements Filed
24 24 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Thu 04/02 9:07 AM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incomplete PDF Image Attached to the Docket Entry; specifically, Local Form 4 was not provided. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE REQUIRED LOCAL FORM 4 AND LINK TO (DE# 21). (Adam, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
23 23 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Wed 04/01 2:48 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
22 22 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 04/01 2:41 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 21 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC
21 21 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Wed 04/01 2:40 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule B,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,] Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
20 20 order Order (Generic) Wed 03/18 10:10 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 4/1/2015. Related [+]. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] DE#38 in Lead Case No 15-14066 AJC
Friday, March 13, 2015
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 03/14 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/13/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015.
Thursday, March 12, 2015
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/13 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/12/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14078 AJC (Re:11 )
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 03/12 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/11/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting Motion To Transfer Case, to the Honorable Judge A. Jay Cristol (Re:5 ).
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/12 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/11/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Laurel M Isicoff Removed from Case.
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/11 12:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 11 Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC,13 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
14 14 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Wed 03/11 10:14 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
13 13 order Joint Administration Order Tue 03/10 4:52 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14078 AJC Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] #11
Monday, March 09, 2015
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/09 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion to Transfer Case (Intra-District)
11 11 motion Joint Administration Mon 03/09 1:54 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 BKC-AJC; 15-14086 BKC-AJC into Lead Case 15-14087 BKC-AJC Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Notice of Judge Reassignment (After Order) Mon 03/09 1:28 PM
Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Laurel M Isicoff Removed from Case. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Transfer Case (Intra-District) Order Mon 03/09 1:14 PM
Order Granting Motion To Transfer Case, to the Honorable Judge A. Jay Cristol Related [+]. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-] #5
8 8 court Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Mon 03/09 12:30 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Related [+] (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-] 4 Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 03/18/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128.
Saturday, March 07, 2015
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/08 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2015. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015].
Thursday, March 05, 2015
6 6 court Notice of Deficiency Thu 03/05 4:54 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2015. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015]. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Thu 03/05 2:47 PM
Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division Judge A. Jay Cristol Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference Thu 03/05 11:26 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 03/18/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
3 3 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 03/04 6:27 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC,2 Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 03/04 6:27 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor 100M Arlington, LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Wed 03/04 6:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 03/04 6:29 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-14078 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23908039. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]