Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-bk-14079
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2015
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Nov 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
100M West Kendall LLC
1201 Brickell Ave Ste 210
Miami, FL 33131-4028
Represented By
Paul J. Battista, Esq
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, December 22, 2016
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/23 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Final Decree .
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
40 40 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/20 2:52 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11] Tue 12/20 2:51 PM
Final Decree . (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
38 38 trustee UST Notice of No Objection to Entry of Final Decree (Ch 11) [PAPERLESS] Fri 12/09 11:37 AM
The debtor in the above case has filed a Final Report and Motion for Entry of Final Decree. The debtor has certified that the case has been fully administered. Based upon the Debtor's Final Report, the United States Trustee has no objection to the Court granting the Debtor's Motion for Final Decree. The Debtor will remain liable for United States Trustee Quarterly Fees for each calendar quarter (or portion thereof) through the date the Final Decree is entered in this case. The United States Trustee reserves the right to seek to have the Final Decree vacated should any United States Trustee Quarterly Fees remain unpaid through date of closing by the court. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Armengol, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
37 37 misc Final Report of Estate (Ch 11) Thu 11/10 5:09 PM
Final Report of Estate and Motion for Final Decree Closing Case Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. Deadline for US Trustee to Object to Final Report: 12/12/2016. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
36 36 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 10:58 AM
Order Granting Motion to Deconsolidate the Cases and Designate a New LEAD Case. The Reorganized Debtors NEW Lead Case will be 100M WEST KENDALL LLC, Case No. 15-14079 BKC-AJC. [Docketed as ECF #521 in 15-14066 AJC]. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 10:46 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order (I) Directing the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to Administratively Close the Dissolved Debtors (as Defined Herein) and Enter a Final Decree. [DOCKETED AS ECF #520 IN 15-14066 AJC] . (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
34 34 misc Debtor in Possession Report Tue 10/04 10:39 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2016 to August 31, 2016 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2016
33 33 misc Trustee's Monthly/Quarterly Financial Report Thu 07/21 10:31 AM
Trustee's Quarterly Financial Report for the Period Beginning 4/1/2016 and Ending 6/30/2016 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
32 32 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 05/02 12:52 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of January 1, 2016 to March 31, 2016 Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
31 31 misc Debtor in Possession Report Wed 01/27 5:17 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of November 5, 2015 to December 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2015
30 30 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 11/23 1:10 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2015 to November 4, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
29 29 order Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 11/18 6:16 PM
Order (I) Granting Final Approval of First Amended Joint Disclosure Statement In Connection With First Joint Plan of Reorganization for the Debtors; and (II) Confirming First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan. Paul J. Battista, Esq Named as Disbursing Agent. Post-Confirmation Status hearing to be held on 01/28/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
28 28 claims Transfer/Assignment of Claim Mon 10/26 4:28 PM
Agreed Transfer/Assignment of Claim [Fee Amount $25] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: LSJ Corporation dba GraphPlex Signs (Claim No. 2, To Fair Harbor Capital, LLC Filed by Fair Harbor Capital LLc (Knox). (Fair Harbor Capital LLc (Knox))
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 10/26 4:31 PM
Receipt of Transfer/Assignment of Claim 15-14079 AJC) [claims,trclm] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25924850. Fee amount 25.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
27 27 misc Debtor in Possession Report Thu 10/22 2:14 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
26 26 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 09/21 4:46 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
25 25 misc Debtor in Possession Report Fri 08/21 10:44 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
24 24 misc Debtor in Possession Report Tue 07/21 10:24 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2015
23 23 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 06/22 4:01 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
22 22 misc Debtor in Possession Report Thu 05/21 1:47 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
21 21 misc Debtor in Possession Report Wed 04/22 12:22 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of March 4, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
20 20 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 04/01 5:02 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 18 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC
19 19 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Wed 04/01 5:01 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Wed 04/01 5:01 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule B,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] [Fee Amount $30] Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 4
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 04/01 7:03 PM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed 15-14079 AJC) [misc,schsia] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24161291. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
17 17 order Order (Generic) Wed 03/18 10:13 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 4/1/2015. Related [+]. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] DE#38 in Lead Case No 15-14066 AJC
Friday, March 13, 2015
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 03/14 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/13/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015.
Thursday, March 12, 2015
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/13 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/12/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14079 AJC (Re:10 )
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/11 12:23 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 10 Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC,12 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Wed 03/11 10:17 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
12 12 order Joint Administration Order Tue 03/10 4:54 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14079 AJC Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] #10
Monday, March 09, 2015
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/09 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Transfer Case (Intra-District)
10 10 motion Joint Administration Mon 03/09 1:54 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 BKC-AJC; 15-14086 BKC-AJC into Lead Case 15-14087 BKC-AJC Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 08, 2015
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/09 1:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/08/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Robert A Mark Removed from Case.
Saturday, March 07, 2015
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/08 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2015. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015. Schedule I due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015].
Friday, March 06, 2015
7 7 court Notice of Judge Reassignment (After Order) Fri 03/06 3:38 PM
Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Robert A Mark Removed from Case. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Transfer Case (Intra-District) Order Fri 03/06 3:37 PM
Order Granting Motion To Transfer Case to the Honorable Judge A. Jay Cristol. Related [+] (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, March 05, 2015
5 5 court Notice of Deficiency Thu 03/05 4:49 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 3/18/2015. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015. Schedule I due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015]. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Thu 03/05 2:22 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division Judge A. Jay Cristol Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
3 3 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 03/04 6:34 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC,2 Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 03/04 6:34 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor 100M West Kendall LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Wed 03/04 6:32 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 03/04 8:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-14079 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23908309. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]