Bankmanagers Corporation et al v. Federal Insurance Company et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rudolph T Randa |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-00871 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2011 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2013 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2017 2:46 AM CST |
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Koss Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bankmanagers Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Park Bank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/14/2011 7:00 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 15, 2011 | ||
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) | ||
Summons' Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Koss Corporation. (djd) | ||
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re2 Certificate filed by plaintiffs; this is an incorrect event. For future reference, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1, the required document is a Disclosure Statement, therefore Disclosure Statement should have been chosen as the event. This document does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (djd) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Bankmanagers Corporation, Park Bank. ( Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1361113)(Hopkins, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Federal Insurance Company, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Koss Corporation | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE by All Plaintiffs of Interest (Hopkins, Michael) |