Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-bk-14086
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Apr 06, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jul 06, 2015
Terminated:Dec 20, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Nov 18, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
100 M Franchise LLC
1201 Brickell Ave Ste 210
Miami, FL 33131-4028
Represented By
Paul J. Battista, Esq
contact info
Mariaelena Gayo-Guitian
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Thursday, December 22, 2016
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/23 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/22/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Final Decree .
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
44 44 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 12/20 2:49 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
43 43 order Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11] Tue 12/20 2:49 PM
Final Decree . (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
42 42 misc Final Report of Estate (Ch 11) Tue 12/20 1:29 PM
Final Report of Estate and Motion for Final Decree Closing Case Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC . Deadline for US Trustee to Object to Final Report: 12/12/2016. (Garcia, Nelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
41 41 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 11:00 AM
Order Granting Motion to Deconsolidate the Cases and Designate a New LEAD Case. The Reorganized Debtors NEW Lead Case will be 100M WEST KENDALL LLC, Case No. 15-14079 BKC-AJC. [Docketed as ECF #521 in 15-14066 AJC]. (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order (Generic) Tue 10/25 10:50 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order (I) Directing the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court to Administratively Close the Dissolved Debtors (as Defined Herein) and Enter a Final Decree. [DOCKETED AS ECF #520 IN 15-14066 AJC] . (Cohen, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
39 39 misc Debtor in Possession Report Tue 10/04 10:40 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2016 to August 31, 2016 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2016
38 38 misc Trustee's Monthly/Quarterly Financial Report Thu 07/21 10:27 AM
Trustee's Quarterly Financial Report for the Period Beginning 4/1/2016 and Ending 6/30/2016 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2016
37 37 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 05/02 12:50 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of January 1, 2016 to March 31, 2016 Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
36 36 misc Debtor in Possession Report Wed 01/27 5:05 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of November 15, 2015 to December 31, 2015 Quarterly Operating Report Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
35 35 utility Utility - Update Claims Register Tue 11/24 11:29 AM
Updated Claims Register, Per DE#420 in Main Case No 15-14066 Order Sustaining Third Omnibus Objection to Claim(s)(Unsecured Claims) Related [+]. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] # 316
Monday, November 23, 2015
34 34 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 11/23 1:08 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of October 1, 2015 to November 4, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2015
33 33 order Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 11/18 6:24 PM
Order (I) Granting Final Approval of First Amended Joint Disclosure Statement In Connection With First Joint Plan of Reorganization for the Debtors; and (II) Confirming First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan. Paul J. Battista, Esq Named as Disbursing Agent. Post-Confirmation Status hearing to be held on 01/28/2016 at 10:30 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
32 32 misc Debtor in Possession Report Thu 10/22 2:02 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of September 1, 2015 to September 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
31 31 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Thu 09/24 2:05 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 30 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC
30 30 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Thu 09/24 2:04 PM
Amended Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule F,] [Fee Amount $30] Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 4
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 09/24 2:07 PM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed 15-14086 AJC) [misc,schsia] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25665561. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
29 29 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 09/21 2:28 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
28 28 misc Debtor in Possession Report Fri 08/21 10:37 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
27 27 misc Debtor in Possession Report Tue 07/21 10:26 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2015
26 26 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 06/22 3:52 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (Amended) Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Debtor in Possession Report Mon 06/22 2:01 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
24 24 misc Debtor in Possession Report Thu 05/21 12:13 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
23 23 misc Debtor in Possession Report Wed 04/22 10:59 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for the Period of March 4, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
22 22 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 04/01 7:02 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 20 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC
21 21 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Wed 04/01 7:01 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements Wed 04/01 7:01 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Schedules,Schedule A,Schedule B,Schedule D,Schedule E,Schedule F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] [Fee Amount $30] Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Form 4
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 04/01 7:03 PM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed 15-14086 AJC) [misc,schsia] ( 30.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24161291. Fee amount 30.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 03/24 12:04 PM
Request for Service by Eric C Cotton Filed by Creditor DDR Southeast Fountains, LLC. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
18 18 order Order (Generic) Wed 03/18 10:23 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 4/1/2015. Related [+]. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] DE#38 in Lead Case No 15-14066 AJC
Friday, March 13, 2015
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 03/14 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/13/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015.
Thursday, March 12, 2015
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/13 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/12/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14086 AJC (Re:11 )
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/11 12:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 11 Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC,13 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
14 14 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Wed 03/11 10:21 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/6/2015 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 6/5/2015. Proofs of Claim due by 7/6/2015. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
13 13 order Joint Administration Order Tue 03/10 5:01 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Lead Case 15-14066 AJC With Member Case 15-14086 AJC Related [+] (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] #11
Monday, March 09, 2015
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/09 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 6 Order of Reassignment/Recusal
11 11 motion Joint Administration Mon 03/09 1:57 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 15-14066 BKC-AJC; 15-14067 BKC-AJC; 15-14069 BKC-AJC; 15-14070 BKC-AJC; 15-14072 BKC-AJC; 15-14074 BKC-AJC; 15-14075 BKC-AJC; 15-14077 BKC-AJC; 15-14078 BKC-AJC; 15-14079 BKC-AJC; 15-14080 BKC-AJC; 15-14083 BKC-AJC; 15-14086 BKC-AJC into Lead Case 15-14087 BKC-AJC Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 08, 2015
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/09 1:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/08/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case. Involvement of Robert A Mark Terminated. Judge A. Jay Cristol Added to Case.
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/09 1:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/08/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Robert A Mark Removed from Case.
Saturday, March 07, 2015
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/08 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015].
Friday, March 06, 2015
7 7 court Notice of Judge Reassignment (After Order) Fri 03/06 9:39 AM
Notice of Judge Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case, Judge Robert A Mark Removed from Case. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order of Reassignment/Recusal Fri 03/06 9:38 AM
Order Transferring Bankruptcy Case. Involvement of Robert A Mark Terminated. Judge A. Jay Cristol Added to Case. (Snipes, Jeanne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2015
5 5 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Thu 03/05 2:26 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division Judge A. Jay Cristol Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice of Deficiency Thu 03/05 10:47 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Schedules due 3/18/2015. Schedule A due 3/18/2015. Schedule B due 3/18/2015. Schedule D due 3/18/2015. Schedule E due 3/18/2015. Schedule F due 3/18/2015. Schedule G due 3/18/2015. Schedule H due 3/18/2015.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/18/2015.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/18/2015. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/18/2015]. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
3 3 1 pgs attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 03/04 8:06 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney Paul J. Battista Esq Related [+]. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC,2 Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 03/04 8:05 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor 100 M Franchise LLC. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Wed 03/04 8:03 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 03/04 8:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-14086 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23908309. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]