100 M Holding Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-14066
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-14087 |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 18, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
100 M Holding Inc.
1201 Brickell Ave Ste 210
Miami, FL 33131-4028 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
1. | Parent of 100 Montaditos hopes to emerge from bankruptcy later this year (miamiherald.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/09/2015 | |
2. | 100 Montaditos files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy in its U.S. operation (nrn.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/09/2015 | |
3. | Report: 100 Montaditos Files for Bankruptcy, NYC Expansion Halted (boweryboogie.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/09/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |