Xu v. The City of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Referred: | Robert W Lehrburger |
Case #: | 1:08-cv-11339 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2008 |
Re-opened: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2015 11:32 PM EDT |
Defendant
Dennis J. King
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brenda M. McIntyre
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Jane R. Zucker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yan Ping Xu
12 Mallar Ave.
Bay Shore, NY 11706 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
The City of New York
Terminated: 03/10/2009
|
Represented By
|