Texas Best Equipment, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 2:15-bk-20111 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Texas Best Equipment, LLC
16200 Joe Garza Sr. Rd.
Brownsville, TX 78521 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401 |
Docket last updated: 32 seconds ago |
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
claims
Withdrawal of Claim
Wed 02/01 11:23 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 6 (Brown, Mary) |
|
Sunday, August 02, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/03 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/02/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Fri 07/31 6:30 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Schedule A
Thu 05/28 10:34 PM
Summary of Schedules, Schedule A , Schedule B , Schedule D , Schedule E , Schedule F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs (Filed By Texas Best Equipment, LLC ). (Wilson, Natalie) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Mon 03/30 4:12 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors? No. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case? No. (arodriguez) |
|
Thursday, March 12, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/13 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/12/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Emergency
Tue 03/10 5:23 PM
Order for Joint Administration and/or Transfer of Cases: LEAD CASE 15-20107 span id="relexpand-29177880" class="related" onClick="toggleRelated('29177880');"> Related [+] Signed on 3/10/2015. (lgar) |
|
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/09 4:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael B. Schmidt Filed by on behalf of CC Distributors, Inc. (Schmidt, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/09 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jay L Krystinik Filed by on behalf of De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc. (Krystinik, Jay) |
|
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 03/09 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen Douglas Statham (Statham, Stephen) |
||
Sunday, March 08, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Amended Petition (Attorney Use)
Sun 03/08 3:37 PM
Amended Petition (Filed By Texas Best Equipment, LLC ). (Ayers, Roderick) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate
Sun 03/08 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service of Emergency Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases (Filed By Texas Best Equipment, LLC ) (Ayers, Roderick) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Emergency Motion
Sun 03/08 8:19 AM
Emergency Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Bankruptcy Cases Filed by Debtor Texas Best Equipment, LLC (Ayers, Roderick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, March 07, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Sat 03/07 11:08 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Texas Best Equipment, LLC. (Ayers, Roderick) |
|
crditcrd
none
Sat 03/07 11:09 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-20111 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16687666. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |