Member Case
Lead case is: 1:11-bk-12999

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Allan L Gropper
Case #: 1:11-bk-13001
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Aug 01, 2011
Dismissed:Jul 17, 2012
Terminated:Aug 21, 2012

Debtor
Heights Management 67, LLC
1123 Broadway Ste 617
New York, NY 10010-2109
Represented By
Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq.
Law Offices Of Gabriel Del Virginia
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 21, 2012
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2012
15 15 Order signed on 7/16/2012 Granting Motion To Dismiss Case Related [+] . (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, June 13, 2012
14 14 Motion to Dismiss Case This Administrative Entry was Entered to Reflect the Accurate Docket Event Code. filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y.. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2011
Case Joint Administration Lead 11-12999 (Chou, Rosalyn).
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2011
13 13 4 pgs Order Signed on 7/29/2011 Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases (An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Heights Management 63, LLC; Heights Management 67, LLC; Heights Management 176, LLC; and Heights Management 181, LLC. The docket in Case No. 11-12999 (ALG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.) Related [+] (Porter, Marguerite)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, July 11, 2011
12 12 Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 67, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 67, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice of Presentment Related [+] filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 67, LLC. with presentment to be held on 7/29/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 67, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 08, 2011
8 8 Affidavit /Declaration of Eric Brown Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules. filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 67, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2011
7 7 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] . Service Date 06/30/2011. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Tuesday, June 28, 2011
6 6 Request for 341(a) Notice with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2011 at 02:30 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Lopez, Mary).
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Conference Order Signed on 6/28/2011, with Hearing to be Held on 7/13/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Porter, Marguerite)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2011
4 4 Notice of Appearance od 63 PM LLC and New Park Ventures LLC filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Appearance of 63 PM LLC and New Park Ventures LLC filed by Michael S. Simon on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Simon, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 Matrix filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of HEIGHTS MANAGEMENT 67, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 7/6/2011. Schedule A due 7/6/2011. Schedule B due 7/6/2011. Schedule C due 7/6/2011. Schedule D due 7/6/2011. Schedule E due 7/6/2011. Schedule F due 7/6/2011. Schedule G due 7/6/2011. Schedule H due 7/6/2011. Schedule I due 7/6/2011. Schedule J due 7/6/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 7/6/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 7/6/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/6/2011. Atty Disclosure State. due 7/6/2011. Statement of Operations Due: 7/6/2011. Balance Sheet Due Date:7/6/2011. Employee Income Record Due: 7/6/2011. Exhibit D due: 7/6/2011. Exhibit D for Joint Debtor due: 7/6/2011. Debtor Signature re: Relief Availability due 7/6/2011. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/6/2011. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 06/29/2011 Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 7/6/2011. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 7/6/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 7/6/2011, Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/20/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 10/20/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 7/22/2011, Filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. of Law Offices of Gabriel Del Virginia on behalf of HEIGHTS MANAGEMENT 67, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Resolution/Authority
Att: 2 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Judge Allan L. Gropper added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-13001 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7724855. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Case Related to Case Number: 11-11782 Buzz Parking II, LLC . (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]