New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Allan L Gropper
Case #: 1:11-bk-12999
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Aug 01, 2011
Dismissed:Jul 17, 2012
Terminated:Jul 26, 2012

Debtor
Heights Management 63, LLC
1123 Broadway Ste 617
New York, NY 10010-2109
Represented By
Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq.
Law Offices Of Gabriel Del Virginia
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Andrew D. Velez-Rivera
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Thursday, July 26, 2012
Case Closed. (Slinger, Kathy).
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2012
24 24 Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss. Related [+] . Notice Date 07/19/2012. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Tuesday, July 17, 2012
23 23 Order signed on 7/16/2012 Granting Motion To Dismiss Case Related [+] . (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, June 13, 2012
22 22 Motion to Dismiss Case , or Alternatively, Convert Cases to Chapter 7), filed by Andrew D. Velez-Rivera on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 7/16/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 7/6/2012, (Velez-Rivera, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2011
21 21 Order Signed on 8/31/2011 Granting Licensors Relief from Stay. Related [+] (Porter, Marguerite)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, August 17, 2011
20 20 Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 Response of 63 PM, LLC, 176 PM, LLC and 181 PM, LLC ("Licensors") to Debtors' Answer to Licensors' Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Related [+] filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-] 14 ,17
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, August 15, 2011
18 18 Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /First Meeting of Creditors. filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
17 17 Opposition Related [+] filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, August 04, 2011
16 16 Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-] 15 ,14
15 15 Notice of Hearing on Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay Related [+] filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/18/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 8/11/2011, (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1: Management Agreements
Att: 2 Exhibit A-2: Management Agreements
Att: 3 Exhibit A-3: Management Agreements
Att: 4 Exhibit A-4: Management Agreements
Att: 5 Exhibit B: License Holdover Proceeding Agreements
Att: 6 Exhibit C: Stipulations of Settlement
Att: 7 Exhibit D: Default Letter
Att: 8 Exhibit E: Termination Notice
Att: 9 Exhibit F: March Stipulations
Att: 10 Exhibit G: City Marshal Facsimiles
Att: 11 Exhibit H: Printouts of Amounts Owed
Att: 12 Exhibit I: Proposed Order
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee) 11-12999 alg) [motion,185] ( 150.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7825173. Fee amount 150.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2011
13 13 Order Signed on 7/29/2011 Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases (An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Heights Management 63, LLC; Heights Management 67, LLC; Heights Management 176, LLC; and Heights Management 181, LLC. The docket in Case No. 11-12999 (ALG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.) Related [+] (Porter, Marguerite)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, July 11, 2011
12 12 Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 63, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
11 11 Notice of Presentment Related [+] filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 63, LLC. with presentment to be held on 7/29/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 08, 2011
9 9 Affidavit /Declaration of Eric Brown Pursuant to Rule 1007-2 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules. filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2011
8 8 Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] . Service Date 06/30/2011. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Tuesday, June 28, 2011
7 7 Request for 341(a) Notice with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/1/2011 at 02:30 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Chou, Rosalyn).
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Conference Order Signed on 6/28/2011, with Hearing to be Held on 7/13/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Porter, Marguerite)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2011
5 5 Notice of Appearance of 63 PM LLC and New Park Ventures LLC filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Appearance of 63 PM LLC and New Park Ventures LLC filed by Michael S. Simon on behalf of 63 PM LLC. (Simon, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Ownership Statement /Resolution . Related [+] filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of HEIGHTS MANAGEMENT 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 Matrix filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of HEIGHTS MANAGEMENT 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 7/6/2011. Schedule A due 7/6/2011. Schedule B due 7/6/2011. Schedule C due 7/6/2011. Schedule D due 7/6/2011. Schedule F due 7/6/2011. Schedule G due 7/6/2011. Schedule H due 7/6/2011. Schedule I due 7/6/2011. Schedule J due 7/6/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 7/6/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 7/6/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/6/2011. Atty Disclosure State. due 7/6/2011. Statement of Operations Due: 7/6/2011. Balance Sheet Due Date:7/6/2011. Employee Income Record Due: 7/6/2011. Cash Flow Statement Due:7/6/2011. Exhibit D due: 7/6/2011. Exhibit D for Joint Debtor due: 7/6/2011. Debtor Signature re: Relief Availability due 7/6/2011. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/6/2011. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 06/29/2011 Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 7/6/2011. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 7/6/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 7/6/2011, Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/20/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 10/20/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 7/22/2011, Filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. of Law Offices of Gabriel Del Virginia on behalf of HEIGHTS MANAGEMENT 63, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Judge Allan L. Gropper added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-12999 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7724855. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Case Related to Case Number: 11-11782 Buzz Parking II, LLC . (Porter, Minnie). Modified on 6/22/2011 (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]