Member Case
Lead case is: 1:11-bk-12999

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Allan L Gropper
Case #: 1:11-bk-13003
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2011
Dismissed:Jul 17, 2012
Terminated:Jan 28, 2013

Debtor
Heights Management 181, LLC
1123 Broadway Ste 617
New York, NY 10010-2109
Represented By
Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq.
Law Offices Of Gabriel Del Virginia
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 02/27/2013 10:09 PM EST
Wednesday, June 22, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-13003 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 7724855. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Judge Allan L. Gropper added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
Case Related to Case Number: 11-11782 Buzz Parking II, LLC. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Current Monthly Income Form 22B Due 7/6/2011. Schedule A due 7/6/2011. Schedule B due 7/6/2011. Schedule C due 7/6/2011. Schedule D due 7/6/2011. Schedule E due 7/6/2011. Schedule F due 7/6/2011. Schedule G due 7/6/2011. Schedule H due 7/6/2011. Schedule I due 7/6/2011. Schedule J due 7/6/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 7/6/2011. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 7/6/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/6/2011. Atty Disclosure State. due 7/6/2011. Statement of Operations Due: 7/6/2011. Aty. Signature Page 3 due 7/6/2011. Balance Sheet Due Date:7/6/2011. Employee Income Record Due: 7/6/2011. Exhibit D due: 7/6/2011. Exhibit D for Joint Debtor due: 7/6/2011. Debtor Signature re: Relief Availability due 7/6/2011. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/6/2011. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 06/29/2011 Record of Interest in Education Individual Retirement Account Due: 7/6/2011. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 7/6/2011. Corporate Ownership Statement due by: 7/6/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 7/6/2011, Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/20/2011, Disclosure Statement due by 10/20/2011, Initial Case Conference due by 7/22/2011, Filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. of Law Offices of Gabriel Del Virginia on behalf of Heights Management 181, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Authority to Sign
Att: 2 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
2 2 Matrix filed by Gabriel Del Virginia, Esq. on behalf of Heights Management 181, LLC. (Del Virginia, Esq., Gabriel)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Appearance of 181 PM LLC and New Park Ventures LLC filed by Michael S. Simon on behalf of 181 PM LLC. (Simon, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice of Appearance of 181 PM LLC and New Park Ventures LLC filed by Kathlyn Schwartz on behalf of 181 PM LLC. (Schwartz, Kathlyn)
Related: [-]