Allied VGH Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10503
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10503
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:15-bk-10505 |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | More than $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Allied VGH Inc.
9790 Gateway Dr Ste 200
Reno, NV 89521-8923 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Final Decree Signed on 11/6/2019 (LAM) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 11/06 9:35 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Final Claims Register (Alphabetical) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. // Statement of Financial Affairs for Allied VGH Inc. (Case No. 15-10505 (MFW)) Filed by Allied VGH Inc.. (Tarr, Stanley) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. // Schedule of Assets and Liabilities for Allied VGH Inc. (Case No. 15-10505 (MFW)) Filed by Allied VGH Inc.. (Tarr, Stanley) |
|
Wednesday, March 11, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases . An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Allied Nevada Gold Corp. (Case No. 15-10503 (MFW) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 15-10503 (MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 3/11/2015 (SJS) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/10 1:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-10505 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 86633, amount $1717.00. (VIB) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration // Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Allied VGH Inc.. (Tarr, Stanley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Allied VGH Inc.. (Tarr, Stanley) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 03/10 8:53 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (AK) |