Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:15-bk-10503
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 19, 2015
Terminated:Nov 06, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Oct 08, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Allied Nevada Gold Corp.
9790 Gateway Drive, Suite 200
Reno, NV 89521
Represented By
Philip C. Dublin
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Victoria A. Guilfoyle
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Ira S. Dizengoff
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Fagen
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Alexis Freeman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Michael David Debaecke
Blank Romellp
contact info
Nicholas P. Stabile
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Sean E. O'Donnell
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Christopher W. Carty
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Stanley B. Tarr
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:10 PM EST
Attorney
Polsinelli PC
Attorney
Mining, Rock Excavation and Construction LLC
3700 East 68th Ave.
Commerce City, CO 80022
Represented By
James S. Yoder
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Attorney
Arent Fox LLP
Attorney
Atlas Copco Customer Finance USA LLC
Represented By
James S. Yoder
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Christopher R. Belmonte
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor
Sarah Pender
2596 N. Girls School Rd.
Indianapolis, IN 46214
Creditor
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Wisler
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Claims Recovery Group LLC
92 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Represented By
Allison R Axenrod
Claims Recevery Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC
Creditor
Thomas Scaramellino
300 E. 23rd Street
New York, NY 10010
Creditor
Royal Gold
100 W. Liberty Street, 10th Floor
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
Kaaran Thomas
Mcdonald Carano Wilson, LLP
contact info
Ryan J. Works
Mcdonald Carano Wilson LLP
contact info
Karen Thomas
Mcdonald Carano Wilson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Purcell Tire NW Inc. f/k/a D&D Tire, Inc.
Represented By
Tobey M. Daluz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cummins Rocky Mountain, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Wisler
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Karen B. Skomorucha Owens
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
William Pierce Bowden
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Jill L. Nicholson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Emil P. Khatchatourian
C/o Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Creditor
Pioneer Funding Group, LLC
Greeley Square Station P.O. Box 20188
New York, NY 10001
Creditor
Diligent Corporation f/k/a Diligent Board Member Services, Inc.
Represented By
Justin R. Alberto
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
People's Capital & Leasing Corp.
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sonar Credit Partners III, LLC
80 Business Park Drive Suite 208
Armonk, NY 10504
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor
MB Financial Bank N.A.
Represented By
Sherry Lowe Johnson
contact info
Karen M. Grivner
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Creditor
Graymont Western US Inc
Dep. CH 17976
Palatine, IL 60055
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Oren B. Haker
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Bria LaSalle Mertens
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Creditor
Desa J. Hooter
990 Cypress Station Dr. Apt. 1501
Houston, TX 77090
Creditor
Humboldt County
Represented By
Louis M Bubala III
Kaempfer Crowell
contact info
Michael Macdonald
Humboldt County
contact info
Janet L Chubb
Kaempfer Crowell
contact info
Creditor
Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.
Represented By
David Piper
Keesal, Young & Logan
contact info
Terry Ross
Keesal, Oung & Logan
contact info
Tara B Voss
Keesal, Young & Logan
contact info
Creditor
Key Equipment Finance
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
1 University Plaza, Suite 312
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
Norman D. Schoenfeld
Liquidity Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Creditor
Amber Lambert
P. O. Box 88550
Parl, MS 39288
Creditor
Ann Arias
P.O. Box 3000
Good Year, AZ 85395
Creditor
Western Alliance Bank
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Stites & Harbison PLLC 250 West Main St Suite 2300
Lexington, KY 40507
Represented By
W. Blaine Early, III
Stites & Harbison PLLC
contact info
William T. Gorton, III
Stites & Harbison PLLC
contact info
Elizabeth Lee Thompson
Stites & Harbison, PLLC
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Andrew V. Tenzer
Paul Hastings, LLP
contact info
Erin R Fay
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
ASM Capital SPV, L.P.
7600 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797
Represented By
Adam Scott Moskowitz
Asm Capital, LP
contact info
Creditor
ASM Capital V, L.P.
7600 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797
Represented By
Adam Scott Moskowitz
Asm Capital, LP
contact info
Creditor
Washington Federal, a national banking association
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Washington Federal N.A.
Jennings, Haug & Cunningham, L.L.P. 2800 N. Central Ave., Suite 1800
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
John G. Sinodis
Jennings, Haug & Cunningham, L.L.P.
contact info
Creditor
W.W. GRAINGER, INC.
Represented By
Mark Andrew Fink
Montgomery, Mccracken, Walker & Rhoads
contact info
Creditor
Wayne R. Albright
301 Institution Dr.
Bellefonte, PA 16823
Creditor
Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By
Peter James Duhig
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Ellen Slights
contact info
Creditor
Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC
Represented By
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Marsha A. Houston
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Frederick Banks
3550 Hwy 468 W
Whitfield, MS 39193
Creditor
Behre Dolbear & Company (USA), Inc.
Represented By
Thomas C. Bell
Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bianchi's Auto and Truck Parts, Inc.
400 Capitol Mall Suite 2560
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Margaret E. Garms
contact info
Creditor
Bridge Capital Leasing, Inc.
7815 NW 148 Street
Miami Lakes, FL 33016
Represented By
Joseph C. Savino
Lazer, Aptheker, Rosella & Yedid, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
United States of America on Behalf of the Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Ward W. Benson
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Creditor
California Public Employees Retirement System
Nixon Peabody LLP One Embarcadero Center 18th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Louis J. Cisz, III
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Lee Harrington
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Creditor
Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. fka All Points Capital Corp.
Represented By
Matthew B. Heimann
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Joseph Lubertazzi, Jr.
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Jeffrey N Rothleder
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Robert M. Hirsh
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Robert M Hirsh
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Christopher A. Ward
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Financial Advisor
Zolfo Cooper, LLC
Represented By
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Financial Advisor
Moelis & Company LLC
Represented By
Sarah Harnett
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison
contact info
Meghan M. Dougherty
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton, Garison
contact info
Interested Party
Silver Standard Resources, Inc.
Represented By
Risa Lynn Wolf-Smith
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Andrey Slomnitsky
Represented By
Daniel Kuznicki
Brower Piven, P.C.
contact info
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
S. Jason Teele
Lowenstein Sandler PC
contact info
Michael S. Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Yelena Trepetin
Brower Piven, P.C.
contact info
Nicholas B. Vislocky
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Charles J. Piven
Brower Piven, P.C.
contact info
David A.P. Brower
Brower Piven, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Rich Carnegie
Interested Party
State of Nevada
Carson City, NV 89701
Represented By
Jasmine K. Mehta
Deputy Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
David S. Stone
Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg LLP 2 N. LaSalle Street Suite 1700
Chicago, IL 60602
Interested Party
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
Represented By
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Interested Party
TR Capital Management, LLC
PO Box 633
Woodmere, NY 11598
Interested Party
Stoyan Tachev
Interested Party
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
150 Grand Street, Suite 401
White Plains, NY 10601
Interested Party
The Bank of Nova Scotia
Represented By
Richard G. Mason
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Erin R Fay
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Alisha J. Turak
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
John R. Sobolewski
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Interested Party
The Official Committee of Equity Security Holders
Represented By
Karen B. Skomorucha Owens
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info
Tamar Lusztig
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Shawn J. Rabin
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Stacy L. Newman
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info
Edgar Guy Sargent
Susman Godfrey (wa)
contact info
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Interested Party
Brian Tuttle
3424 Belmont Blvd.
Sarasota, FL 34232
Interested Party
CT Corporation
Interested Party
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
Represented By
William Pierce Bowden
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Interested Party
Ad hoc Committee of Shareholders
Interested Party
WK Mining (USA) Ltd.
Represented By
Douglas N. Candeub
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Rew R. Goodenow
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group and DIP Parties
Represented By
Michael C. Keats
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Kenneth Pasquale
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Jayme Goldstein
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Kristopher M. Hansen
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Daniel P Ginsberg
contact info
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Robert F. Poppiti, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Committee of Allied Nevada Inc. Shareholders
Represented By
Thomas F. Driscoll, III
The Bifferato Firm PA
contact info
Interested Party
West Kirkland Mining Inc.
Represented By
Douglas N. Candeub
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Rew R. Goodenow
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Interested Party
Clover Nevada LLC
Represented By
Matthew G. Martinez
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Jessica C. Boelter
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Tyler D. Semmelman
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
LPB Holdings Ltd.
Represented By
Jonathan M. Stemerman
Elliott Greenleaf
contact info
Interested Party
Maverick Silver, Inc.
Represented By
Risa Lynn Wolf-Smith
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ahmad Elassadi
7610 Wedgewood Drive
Manassas, VA 20109
Interested Party
Moody's Investors Service, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher R. Belmonte
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Pamela A. Bosswick
Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP
contact info
Interested Party
PacerPro, Inc.
Four Embarcadero Center Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Gavin McGrane
Mcgrane LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Dundee Securities Ltd., and Cormark Securities Inc.
Represented By
William F. Gray
Torys LLP
contact info
Alison D. Bauer
Torys LLP
contact info
Evelyn J. Meltzer
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
David MacGreevey of Zolfo Cooper, LLC, solely in his capacity as Creditor Representative
Represented By
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Interested Party
Jordan Darga
P. O. Box 120640
Clermont, FL 34712
Interested Party
Computershare, Inc.
Interested Party
James H. Roberson
1460 Saluda Dam Road
Easley, SC 29640
Interested Party
Computershare Trust Company of Canada, as Indenture Trustee
Represented By
Tina Niehold Moss
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Francis A. Monaco, Jr.
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Sierra Pacific Power Company
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Runge, Inc. d/b/a RungePincockMinarco
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
Official Committee of Equity Security Holders
Represented By
Michael J. Crosnicker
Leclairryan
contact info
Richard A. McGuirk
Leclairryan
contact info
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Janice B. Grubin
Leclairryan
contact info
Gregory J. Mascitti
Leclairryan, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Nicholas J. Brannick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
UpShot Services LLC
www.upshotservices.com 8269 E. 23rd Avenue, Suite 275
Denver, CO 80238
Other Prof.
Navigant Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
SRK Consulting (U.S.), Inc.
Other Prof.
Cole Schotz P.C.
500 Delaware Avenue Suite 1410
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
LeClairRyan, A Professional Corporation
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Other Prof.
Gordian Group, LLC
Transcriber
EScribers, LLC
PO Box 7533
New York, NY 10116
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Tiiara N. A. Patton
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Natalie M. Cox
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Tiiara N. A. Patton
United States Department Of Justice
contact info

Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Monday, October 19, 2020
1599 1599 court Withdrawal of Standing Order/Transcripts Mon 10/19 4:21 PM
The transcriber has withdrawn the standing order for hearings in this case at the request of counsel.Terminating EScribers, LLC. Related [+]. (EScribers, LLC)
Related: [-] 1547