Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10503

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:15-bk-10508
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2015
Terminated:Nov 06, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
ANG Cortez LLC
9790 Gateway Dr Ste 200
Reno, NV 89521-8923
Represented By
Stanley B. Tarr
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
8 8 order Final Decree Wed 11/06 9:31 AM
Final Decree Signed on 11/6/2019 (LAM)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 11/06 9:38 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
7 7 claims Claims Register Tue 10/15 6:08 PM
Final Claims Register (Alphabetical) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Final Claims Register (Numeric)
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 04/28 3:21 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. // Statement of Financial Affairs for ANG Cortez LLC (Case No. 15-10508 (MFW)) Filed by ANG Cortez LLC. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 04/28 3:20 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A, Sch B, Sch D, Sch E, Sch F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Schs, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. // Schedule of Assets and Liabilities for ANG Cortez LLC (Case No. 15-10508 (MFW)) Filed by ANG Cortez LLC. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 03/11 3:54 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Related [+]. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Allied Nevada Gold Corp. (Case No. 15-10503 (MFW) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 15-10503 (MFW) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 3/11/2015 (SJS)
Related: [-] case numbers 15-10503 through 15-10516
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 03/10 1:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-10508 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 86633, amount $1717.00. (VIB)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion Tue 03/10 7:19 AM
Motion for Joint Administration // Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed by ANG Cortez LLC. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)
1 1 19 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 03/10 7:03 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by ANG Cortez LLC. (Tarr, Stanley)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 03/10 8:53 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (AK)
Related: [-]