Member Case
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:15-bk-44855
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2015
Terminated:Jan 04, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Scientific Image Center Management, Inc.
100 Kirts Blvd. Suite A
Troy, MI 48084
Represented By
William C. Blasses
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/26/2015 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, March 27, 2015
crditcrd none Fri 03/27 5:30 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-44855 [misc,volp11at] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24871425, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 66 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 03/27 5:27 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Scientific Image Center Management, Inc. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/10/2015. Schedules A-J due 04/10/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/10/2015. Summary of schedules due 04/10/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 04/10/2015. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/27/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 07/27/2015.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 04/27/2015 (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Fri 03/27 5:28 PM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Management, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 03/27 5:28 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Management, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership (debtor) or (motion) Fri 03/27 5:28 PM
Debtors Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Management, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Employ Fri 03/27 6:02 PM
Application to Employ Osipov Bigelman, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Management, Inc. (Blasses, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Fri 03/27 6:04 PM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Management, Inc. Related [+]. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)