Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-44839
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-44839
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Maria L Oxholm |
Case #: | 2:15-bk-44860 |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc.
100 Kirts Blvd, Suite A
Troy, MI 48084 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/26/2015 8:00 PM EDT |
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/27 5:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-44860 [misc,volp11at] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24871493, amount . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/10/2015. Schedules A-J due 04/10/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/10/2015. Summary of schedules due 04/10/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 04/10/2015. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/27/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 07/27/2015. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
![]() 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Debtors Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Application to Employ Osipov Bigelman, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc. (Blasses, William) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Debtor In Possession Scientific Image Center Properties, Inc. . (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |