Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 1:11-bk-11989
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2011
Terminated:Dec 18, 2012

Debtor
Sunland Group, Inc.
1033 LA Posada Dr Ste 370
Austin, TX 78752-3832
Represented By
Stephen W. Sather
Barron & Newburger, P.C.
contact info
Barbara M. Barron
Barron & Newburger, P.C.
contact info
Hershel R. Chapin
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 02/25/2013 8:49 PM CST
Wednesday, August 10, 2011
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (csupld) 11-11989 [caseupld,vol11cu] (1039.00), Amount $1039.00, Receipt 10488386 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 With Schedules, With Statement of Financial Affairs, Without Attorney Disclosure of Compensation ( Filing Fee: $ 1039, ) filed by Sunland Group, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 08/17/2011 (Barron, Barbara)
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Stephen W. Sather for Debtor Sunland Group, Inc. (Sather, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion to Pay Employee Wage Claims and Subcontractors in the Ordinary Course of Business filed by Stephen W. Sather for Debtor Sunland Group, Inc. (Sather, Stephen)
Related: [-]
4 4 Application to Employ Attorneys, Barron & Newburger, P.C. (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Stephen W. Sather for Debtor Sunland Group, Inc. (Sather, Stephen)
Related: [-]