Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul M Black
Case #: 7:15-bk-70444
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Jun 23, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jul 31, 2015
Terminated:Sep 23, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Jan 27, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Xinergy Ltd., Debtor
8351 E Walker Springs Ln Ste 400
Knoxville, TN 37923-3151
Represented By
Henry P. Long, III
Hunton & Williams
contact info
Justin F. Paget
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Tyler Perry Brown
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Sarah Beckett Boehm
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Michael E. Hastings
Whiteford Taylor & Preston, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
USTrustee
Office of the United States Trustee 210 First Street, Suite 505
Roanoke, VA 24011

GPO Jun 11 2015
Memorandum Opinion Signed on 6/11/2015 (RE: related document(s)90 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Pamela Myles, 94 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Janet K. Williams). (Jenkins, Janet)
GPO Feb 03 2016
Memorandum Decision Signed on 2/3/2016 (RE: related document(s)502 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Meral, Inc, 527 Response filed by Debtor Xinergy Ltd., 586 Brief filed by Debtor Xinergy Ltd., 616 Memorandum filed by Creditor Meral, Inc, 626 Response filed by Creditor WPP LLC, 627 Reply filed by Debtor Xinergy Ltd.). (Jenkins, Janet)
GPO Dec 13 2016
Memorandum Decision entered 12/13/2016 by U.S. District Judge Glen E. Conrad Signed on 12/13/2016 (RE: related document(s)692 Order Action). (Jenkins, Janet)
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:03 PM EDT
Thursday, March 04, 2021
810 810 order Release Funds from Court Registry Thu 03/04 3:12 PM
Order Denying Application for payment of Unclaimed Funds of Meral Incorporated. Related [+] (Maddox, Lisa)
Related: [-] 802