Member Case
Lead case is: 7:15-bk-70444

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul M Black
Case #: 7:15-bk-70461
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:Sep 23, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Xinergy Corp., Debtor
8351 E Walker Springs Ln Ste 400
Knoxville, TN 37923-3151
Represented By
Tyler Perry Brown
Hunton & Williams LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
USTrustee
Office of the United States Trustee 210 First Street, Suite 505
Roanoke, VA 24011


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:03 PM EDT
Friday, September 23, 2016
11 11 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 09/23 11:12 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Jenkins, Janet)
Related: [-]
10 10 order X Internal Use Only Fri 09/23 11:11 AM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree and Closing Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 9/23/2016. (Jenkins, Janet)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2015
9 9 misc Schedule G Mon 10/12 1:43 PM
Amended Schedule G Filed by Justin F. Paget on behalf of Xinergy Corp.. (Paget, Justin) Amended Summary of Schedules also filed. Modified on 10/13/2015 (Jenkins, Janet)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2015
8 8 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 06/19 5:55 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Justin F. Paget on behalf of Xinergy Corp.. (Paget, Justin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Balance of Schedules Fri 06/19 5:54 PM
Balance of Schedules (Schedules of Assets and Liabilities) Filed by Justin F. Paget on behalf of Xinergy Corp.. (Paget, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
6 6 utility Case Association Wed 04/08 5:01 PM
Case Association created for Lead Case 7:15-bk-70444 with Member Case 7:15-bk-70461 (Jenkins, Janet)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Entry Wed 04/08 4:39 PM
An Order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Virginia directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Xinergy Ltd.; Xinergy Corp.; Xinergy Finance (US), Inc.; Pinnacle Insurance Group LLC; Xinergy of West Virginia, Inc.; Xinergy Straight Creek, Inc.; Xinergy Sales, Inc.; Xinergy Land, Inc.; Middle Fork Mining, Inc.; Big Run Mining, Inc.; Xinergy of Virginia, Inc.; South Fork Coal Company, LLC; Sewell Mountain Coal Co., LLC; Whitewater Contracting, LLC; Whitewater Resources, LLC; Shenandoah Energy, LLC; High MAF, LLC; Wise Loading Services, LLC; Strata Fuels, LLC; True Energy, LLC; Raven Crest Mining, LLC; Brier Creek Coal Company, LLC; Bull Creek Processing Company, LLC; Raven Crest Minerals, LLC; Raven Crest Leasing, LLC; and Raven Crest Contracting, LLC. The docket in Case No. 15-70444 (PMB) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Related [+] (Jenkins, Janet)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Xinergy Corp.
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
4 4 court Case Assigned Tue 04/07 7:37 AM
Judge Paul M. Black added to case (Jenkins, Janet)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2015
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/06 6:11 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-70461 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5909212. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 motion Joint Administration Mon 04/06 5:53 PM
Motion for Joint Administration (Motion of the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Their Related Chapter 11 Cases) Filed by Debtor Xinergy Corp. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/06 5:53 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Tyler Perry Brown on behalf of Xinergy Corp. (Brown, Tyler)
Related: [-]