Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Leif M Clark
Case #: 3:11-bk-31675
Case Filed:Aug 31, 2011
Converted:Nov 16, 2011
Terminated:Nov 30, 2011

Debtor
Elcoteq, Inc.
1325 Pendale Rd Ste C
El Paso, TX 79936-6912
Represented By
James H. Billingsley
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
Plasticos Promex U.S.A., Inc.
1220 Barranca, Bldg. 4-C
El Paso, TX 79935
Represented By
Corey W. Haugland
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Textape Incorporated
915 Pendale Road
El Paso, TX 79907
Represented By
Corey W. Haugland
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Pallets and Crates International, L.P.
150 S. Alto Mesa
El Paso, TX 79912
Represented By
Corey W. Haugland
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Trustee
J. Marshall Miller
Terminated: 03/08/2012
1519 Montana Avenue
El Paso, TX 79902


1. Free Trade, Comity, and the Bankruptcy Code (business-finance-restructuring.weil.com)
Submitted Fri 11/14/2014
Docket last updated: 03/06/2012 6:00 PM CST
Wednesday, August 31, 2011
ICC-Fee Terminated for Involuntary Petition Chapter 11 11-31675 [misc,involp11] (1039.00), Amount $1039.00, Receipt 10550757 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Involuntary Petition under Chapter 11 ( Filing Fee: $ 1039.00 ) Re: Elcoteq, Inc. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Plasticos Promex U.S.A., Inc., Textape Incorporated (attorney Corey W. Haugland), Plasticos Promex U.S.A., Inc. (attorney Corey W. Haugland), Pallets and Crates International, L.P. (attorney Corey W. Haugland). (Haugland, Corey)
Related: [-]