Member Case
Lead case is: 2:15-bk-45784

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marci B Mcivor
Case #: 2:15-bk-45788
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2015
Terminated:Oct 12, 2016

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
4L Ventures, LLC
45525 Grand River Ave.
Novi, MI 48374
Represented By
Stephen M. Gross
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 17, 2016
37 37 misc Large Bankruptcy Case Post-Confirmation Report Thu 11/17 4:23 PM
Large Bankruptcy Case Post-Confirmation Report Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
36 36 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Tue 10/18 5:28 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for September 2016 Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
35 35 court Copy of Wed 10/12 4:39 PM
Copy of: Order Granting The Liquidating Trustee's Motion For Final Decree Closing 4L Ventures, LLC's Chapter 11 Case. (ckata)
Related: [-]
order Final Decree and Case Closed Wed 10/12 4:42 PM
Final Decree: The bankruptcy estate has been fully administered. The bankruptcy court has decreed that Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust is discharged as trustee of the estate and the bond is cancelled and the chapter 11 case is closed. (ckata)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
34 34 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 09/22 10:57 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 1 Filed by Creditor McNaughton-McKay Electric Company (Lick, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2016
33 33 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Thu 09/15 5:15 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for August 2016 Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2016
32 32 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 08/15 4:51 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for July 2016 Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2016
31 31 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 08/01 3:36 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for June 2016 Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 08/01 3:35 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for May 2016 Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 08/01 3:35 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for April 2016 Filed by Trustee Gene R. Kohut, solely in his capacity as Liquidating Trustee of the LSC Liquidating Trust. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
28 28 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Tue 04/19 3:17 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for March 2016 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 14, 2016
27 27 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 03/14 2:06 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for February 2016 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2016
26 26 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Thu 02/18 11:08 AM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for January, 2016 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2016
25 25 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 01/18 1:33 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for December, 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 15, 2015
24 24 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Tue 12/15 10:25 AM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for November 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
23 23 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Fri 11/20 4:09 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for October 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
22 22 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 11/02 1:57 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for September 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2015
21 21 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 09/21 10:33 AM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for August 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2015
20 20 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Thu 08/20 5:04 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for July 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
19 19 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 07/24 9:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Kochis, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
18 18 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Mon 07/20 10:56 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for June 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2015
17 17 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Thu 06/25 5:15 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for May 2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
16 16 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Tue 06/16 3:34 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for April 13, 2015-April 30, 2015 Amended Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
15 15 misc Schedule A - Real Property Wed 05/13 1:43 PM
Summary of Schedules , Schedule A - Real Property , Schedule B - Personal Property , Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims , Schedule E - Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims , Schedule F - Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority Claims , Schedule G - Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H - CoDebtors Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Gross, Stephen)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 05/13 1:40 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Gross, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2015
13 13 court Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case with BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/17 1:08 AM
Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case with BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/16/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order of Reassignment of Judge
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/17 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/16/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/17 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/16/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Deficiency Notice (BK)
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
10 10 court Document Wed 04/15 4:50 PM
An order (the Joint Administration Order) has been entered in accordance with Fed. R. Bank. R. 1015(d) directing the joint administration of the following cases under case number 15-45784 mbm: Lee Steel Corporation, Case No. 15-45784 mbm; Taylor Industrial Properties, L.L.C., Case No. 15-45785 mbm; and 4L Ventures, LLC, Case No. 15-45788 mbm. Related [+] (kcm)
Related: [-] 9 Order
9 9 order order (Generic) Wed 04/15 4:49 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration Of The Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. (kcm)
Related: [-]
8 8 audio . Wed 04/15 4:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/15/2015 10:04:43 AM ]. File Size [ 19564 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:31 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Motion Granted Wed 04/15 10:31 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held and Motion Granted with Lead Case being Lee Steel Corporation, Case Number 15-45784 Re: Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Case Filed by Debtor In Possession. (O'Hara, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
5 5 order Reassignment of Judge Tue 04/14 11:10 AM
ORDER OF THE COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE: It Appearing from the Court's records for the above entitled case that this case has been assigned to Judge Walter Shapero and it further appearing that the debtor has a Companion Case as defined in L.B.R. 1073-1(b) filed with this Court on 4/13/15 assigned to Judge Marci B. McIvor and it being the practice of this Court, pursuant to L.B.R. 1073-1(a)(1)(E.D.M.), to reassign all subsequently filed cases to the Judge to whom the first case is assigned. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled case be removed from the docket of Judge Walter Shapero.Detroit and transferred to the docket of Judge Marci B McIvor. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Walter Shapero.(wm)
Related: [-]
court Flags Set CASECHECKED Tue 04/14 11:36 AM
Flags Set CASECHECKED. (wm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
6 6 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Tue 04/14 11:30 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Acceptable List of Creditors Not Uploaded, . Acceptable List of Creditors Not Uploaded due by 4/20/2015. (wm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Mon 04/13 7:06 PM
Disclosure of Compensation as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Attorney McDonald Hopkins PLC. (Gross, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Creditor Request for Notice Mon 04/13 3:41 PM
Request for Notice by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC . (Baer, Herbert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Mon 04/13 2:26 PM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession 4L Ventures, LLC. (Gross, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/13 1:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by 4L Ventures, LLC Schedules A-J due 04/27/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/27/2015. Summary of schedules due 04/27/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 04/27/2015. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/11/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 08/11/2015. (Gross, Stephen)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 04/13 1:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-45788 [misc,volp11at] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24978916, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]