California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:15-cv-02739
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2015
Terminated:Sep 11, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Oct 10, 2015 9:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Andrew Goddard
Represented By
Elaine K Kim
Mitchel Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Robert H Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lions Gate Entertainment Inc.
Represented By
Elaine K Kim
Mitchel Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Robert H Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lions Gate Films, Inc.
Represented By
Elaine K Kim
Mitchel Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Robert H Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mutant Enemy, Inc.
Represented By
Elaine K Kim
Mitchel Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Robert H Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Whedon
Represented By
Elaine K Kim
Mitchel Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Robert H Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Movant
Does
Plaintiff
Peter Gallagher
Represented By
Tagore Subramaniam
Matern Law Group
contact info
Matthew John Matern
Matern Law Group
contact info

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 29, 2016
36 36 1 pgs appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Mon 05/02 9:17 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,33 filed by Peter Gallagher. CCA # 15-56588 This case is dismissed pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. Appellees' motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution is denied as moot. (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2015
35 35 10 pgs order Attorney Fees Tue 10/27 4:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 17 U.S.C. 50529 29 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendants Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films Inc shall recover cost and fees in the amount of $47,290.38, inclusive of $2,021.06 in costs. (lc) .Modified on 10/27/2015 (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
34 34 appeal 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice Wed 10/14 2:22 PM
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 15-56588 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,33 as to Plaintiff Peter Gallagher. (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
33 33 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Tue 10/13 5:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by plaintiff Peter Gallagher. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,27 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-16608760.)(Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
32 32 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 10/13 10:56 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs set for hearing on October 26, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby vacated. The motion is taken under submission. No appearances necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2015
31 31 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 10/09 5:17 PM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 17 U.S.C. § 505 29 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2015
30 30 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 10/02 8:42 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 17 U.S.C. § 505 29 filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher.(Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Peter Gallagher
Friday, September 25, 2015
29 29 motion Attorney Fees Fri 09/25 7:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Under 17 U.S.C. § 505 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elaine K. Kim (and Exhibits 1-7) in Support of Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Under 17 U.S.C. § 505,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 505
Friday, September 11, 2015
28 28 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Fri 09/11 5:04 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) Mailed the report and a copy of the order granting defendants' motion to dismiss to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (vv)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Dismiss Case Fri 09/11 4:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court has reviewed the works in question in their entirety and found they are not similar, thus, making proof of access a moot point and any amendment futile. Therefore, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Dismiss with prejudice.18 (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
26 26 order Dismiss Case Wed 06/24 9:02 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Hearing on MOTION to Dismiss Case18 scheduled for June 29, 2015 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
25 25 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 06/15 7:42 PM
REPLY Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2015
24 24 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 06/08 11:57 PM
OPPOSITION in opposition to re: MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher. (Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
23 23 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Wed 06/03 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Incorrect G-114 form re sealed filing of CDs was replaced with G-114 form re filing of regular CDs Re: Exhibit 121 , Exhibit 222 to declaration of Elaine Kim. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
22 22 respm Exhibit to Motion Wed 06/03 12:26 PM
EXHIBIT 2 TO DECLARATION OF ELAINE K KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)18 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (lc) (Main Document 22 replaced on 6/3/2015) (lc)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Exhibit to Motion Wed 06/03 12:23 PM
EXHIBIT 1 TO DECLARATION OF ELAINE K KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (lc) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/3/2015) (lc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
20 20 notice Appearance Mon 06/01 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elaine K Kim on behalf of Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon (Attorney Elaine K Kim added to party Andrew Goddard(pty:dft), Attorney Elaine K Kim added to party Lions Gate Entertainment Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elaine K Kim added to party Lions Gate Films, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elaine K Kim added to party Mutant Enemy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elaine K Kim added to party Joseph Whedon(pty:dft))(Kim, Elaine)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 06/01 2:55 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) 18 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Mon 06/01 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II.(Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elaine K. Kim in Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6),
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6)
17 17 notice Manual Filing (G-92) Mon 06/01 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon of Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Elaine K. Kim in Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in its Entirety with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6).(Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Elaine K. Kim
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
16 16 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/19 12:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 15), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11) is DENIED as MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
Related: [-]
15 15 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 05/19 8:16 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher (Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 18, 2015
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/18 2:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon identifying Defendants as Corporate Parent. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc For Judicial Notice Mon 05/18 2:27 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE 11 filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Manual Filing (G-92) Mon 05/18 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon of Defendants. (Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Case Mon 05/18 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case IN ITS ENTIRETY WITH PREJUDICE filed by Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II.(Attorney Robert H Rotstein added to party Andrew Goddard(pty:dft), Attorney Robert H Rotstein added to party Lions Gate Entertainment Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert H Rotstein added to party Lions Gate Films, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert H Rotstein added to party Mutant Enemy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert H Rotstein added to party Joseph Whedon(pty:dft))(Rotstein, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elaine K. Kim,
Att: 2 Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
10 10 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Tue 04/21 4:50 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Peter Gallagher. (Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 15, 2015
9 9 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/15 10:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; AND REFER TO JUDGES PROCEDURES AND SCHEDULES FOR DETAILED INSTRUCTIONS RE SUBMISSION OF SEALED DOCUMENTS, EXCLUDING THOSE SUBMITTED BY PRO SE PARTIES AND IN CAMERA FILINGS). (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
8 8 notice Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form Tue 04/14 10:23 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 04/14 10:19 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc., Joseph Whedon. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 04/14 10:18 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 04/14 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 04/13 11:55 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher. (Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/13 11:52 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher, (Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/13 11:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher. (Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/13 11:44 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15537021 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Peter Gallagher. (Attorney Matthew John Matern added to party Peter Gallagher(pty:pla))(Matern, Matthew)
Related: [-]