Original Case: 2:15-cv-02739

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-56588
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2015
Terminated:Apr 29, 2016
Last checked: Monday May 02, 2016 4:09 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
LIONS GATE ENTERTAINMENT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Robert H. Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Elaine K. Kim
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LIONS GATE FILMS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Robert H. Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Elaine K. Kim
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MUTANT ENEMY, INC., a California corporation
Represented By
Robert H. Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Elaine K. Kim
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREW GODDARD, an individual
Represented By
Robert H. Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Elaine K. Kim
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH WHEDON, an individual
Represented By
Robert H. Rotstein
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Elaine K. Kim
Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PETER GREEN, FKA Peter Gallagher
Represented By
Peter Green
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2016 4:05 AM PDT
Wednesday, October 14, 2015
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND COUNSEL FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/12/2015. Transcript due 02/10/2016. Appellant Peter Green opening brief due 03/21/2016. Appellees Andrew Goddard, Lions Gate Entertainment, Inc., Lions Gate Films, Inc., Mutant Enemy, Inc. and Joseph Whedon answering brief due 04/20/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9717360] (FB) [Entered: 10/14/2015 09:36 AM]
Related: [-]