|
GPO
Sep 02 2015
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
|
|
GPO
Sep 21 2015
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 17 Objection and Motion Concerning Improper Amendment of Complaint. (BG)
|
|
GPO
Sep 21 2015
ORDER (amended) denying 17 Objection and Motion Concerning Improper Amendment of Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
|
|
GPO
Oct 05 2015
ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
|
|
GPO
Oct 05 2015
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
|
|
GPO
Apr 11 2016
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 33 Defendant's First Motion to Compel Discovery. (ST)
|
|
GPO
Aug 04 2016
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 93 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (ZE)
|