Exco Operating Company LP v. Arnold et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Donald E Walter |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:10-cv-01838 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2010 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2013 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, January 05, 2015 | ||
265 | 265
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 01/06 1:44 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Theodore Settles #454484, Central Michigan Correctional Facility, 320 N Hubbard St, St. Louis, MI 48880 re:264 Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds returned marked: PAROLED, Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Tuesday, December 30, 2014 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Tue 12/30 9:36 AM
REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT in accordance with the Order for Disbursement of Registry Funds filed 12/18/14, Doc#264, was completed on 12/19/14; registry account has been closed. (crt,Williams, C) |