Member Case
Lead case is: 8:15-bk-04671

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:15-bk-04672
Case Filed:May 04, 2015
Dismissed:Oct 14, 2016
Terminated:Nov 15, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
JRG Ventures,LLC
PO Box 20938
Bradenton, FL 34204-0938
Represented By
Amy Denton Harris
Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser PA
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
31 31 misc Financial Reports - Chapter 11 Wed 12/21 4:56 PM
Financial Reports for the Period October 1, 2016 to October 14, 2016. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 11/15 4:22 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
30 30 misc Financial Reports - Chapter 11 Tue 10/25 4:28 PM
Financial Reports for the Period September 1, 2016 to September 30, 2016. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2016
29 29 misc Proof of Service Fri 10/14 2:52 PM
Proof of Service of Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 28
28 28 order Order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Case Fri 10/14 2:12 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Related [+]. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Bernadette)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
27 27 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 09/28 3:15 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Scott Stichter for Dbtr, Denise Barnett for USTEE RULING: *Motion to Dismiss Case. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC (Stichter, Scott) Doc #23 - Granted, order by Stichter Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2016
26 26 notice Notice Of Hearing Thu 08/18 9:47 AM
Notice of Continued Preliminary Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/28/2016 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
25 25 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 08/18 1:06 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Amy Harris for Dbtr, Denise Barnett for USTEE, Ken McIntyre for Unsecured Creditors Comm., Andy Brumby for Rabo Fin. RULING: Motion to Dismiss Case. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC (Stichter, Scott) Doc #23 - Cont. to 9/28 @ 9:30 a.m., Ntc. by Harris Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
24 24 notice Notice Of Hearing Tue 08/16 10:15 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Case Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2016 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 13
court ADI Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing Tue 08/16 11:45 PM
Scott A. Stichter is reminded to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties. Re: Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 08/17/2016 09:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Case. Doc23 . Failure to do so will result in the cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Thu 08/11 3:30 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 08/17/2016 09:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Case. Doc23 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Scott A. Stichter is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Related [+]. (Dkt)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
23 23 motion Motion to Dismiss Case Tue 08/09 11:59 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
22 22 misc Proof of Service Mon 08/08 11:14 AM
Proof of Service of Order Severing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b). Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC Related [+]. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, August 05, 2016
21 21 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/05 3:16 PM
Order Severing the Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) . Service Instructions: Amy Harris is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/24 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/23/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
19 19 misc Proof of Service Tue 09/22 12:35 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Agreed Motion for Authority to Withdraw as Counsel for First State Bank of Arcadia and Terminate Electronic Notice. Filed by Patti W Halloran on behalf of Creditor First State Bank of Arcadia Related [+]. (Halloran, Patti)
Related: [-] 18
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
Monday, September 21, 2015
18 18 order Withdraw As Counsel Mon 09/21 2:06 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw as Counsel for First State Bank and Terminate Electonic Notice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Patti Halloran is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
17 17 motion Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Wed 09/16 2:48 PM
Agreed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for First State Bank of Arcadia and Terminate Electronic Notice Filed by Patti W Halloran on behalf of Creditor First State Bank of Arcadia Related [+]. (Halloran, Patti)
Related: [-] 13
16 16 claims Withdrawal of Claim Wed 09/16 10:02 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 1 Filed by Patti W Halloran on behalf of Creditor First State Bank of Arcadia. (Halloran, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
15 15 misc Notice Of Change of Address - Party Thu 08/27 2:58 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Rabo AgriFinance, Inc. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Individual or Firm Name - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 06/23 10:25 AM
Change of Firm Name Submitted to the Court on June 15, 2015 by Amy Harris of Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A. Now Known as Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
trustee (NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Tue 06/02 6:52 PM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on Monday, June 1, 2015 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Barnett, Denise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2015
14 14 misc SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules) Thu 05/28 5:58 PM
Summary of Schedules , Schedules A - H, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 05/28 6:06 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)(8:15-bk-04672-MGW) [misc,schaja] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 45587877, Amount Paid $ 30.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2015
13 13 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/22 10:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Patti W Halloran on behalf of Creditor First State Bank of Arcadia. (Halloran, Patti)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
Saturday, May 09, 2015
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Operating Order Sun 05/10 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Operating Order Related [+]. Notice Date 05/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, May 07, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Fri 05/08 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 05/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 05/08 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
9 9 order Order To File All State and Federal Tax Returns and Pay Taxes When Due Wed 05/06 9:15 PM
Order to File All State and Federal Tax Returns and Pay Taxes When Due . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 05/06 10:10 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 05/06 9:26 AM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 05/05 4:02 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Joint Administration Tue 05/05 2:13 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration With Case No. 8:15-bk-4671 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Amy Harris is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Dianna)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Tue 05/05 9:45 AM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/1/2015 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL (861) - Room 100-B, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Proofs of Claims due by 8/17/2015. (Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice Of Deficient Filing Tue 05/05 9:28 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Schedules, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Disclosure of Compensation, 20 Largest, Chapter 11 Case Mgmt Summary . Compliance required no later than 5/18/2015. (Ryan)
Related: [-]
assign Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases Tue 05/05 7:39 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Michael G. Williamson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.)
Related: [-]
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Tue 05/05 2:45 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC Related [+]. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-] 5
court (NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases Tue 05/05 3:28 PM
Notice of Joint Administation of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 8:15-bk-4671-MGW Related [+]. (Sabrina)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, May 04, 2015
2 2 motion Motion for Joint Administration Mon 05/04 5:43 PM
Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:15-bk-4671 with 8:15-bk-4672, 8:15-bk-4673, 8:15-bk-4674, and 8:15-bk-4675 Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor JRG Ventures,LLC (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/04 5:15 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of JRG Ventures,LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/1/2015 Disclosure Statement due by 09/1/2015 (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 05/04 5:25 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:15-bk-04672) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 45269312, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Mon 05/04 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]