Member Case
Lead case is: 8:15-bk-04671

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:15-bk-04675
Case Filed:May 04, 2015
Terminated:Aug 27, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
SamWes, LLC
PO Box 20938
Bradenton, FL 34204-0938
Represented By
Amy Denton Harris
Stichter Riedel Blain & Prosser PA
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
22 22 misc Financial Reports - Chapter 11 Tue 10/25 4:31 PM
Financial Reports for the Period July 1, 2016 to August 27, 2016. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 09/01 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 08/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #20 )
Saturday, August 27, 2016
20 20 order Final Decree - Chapter 11 Sat 08/27 11:46 AM
Final Decree. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Sat 08/27 11:47 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
19 19 motion Motion for Final Decree Tue 08/09 11:04 AM
Motion for Final Decree Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
18 18 plan Certificate of Substantial Consummation Tue 08/09 11:03 AM
Certificate of Substantial Consummation Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
17 17 misc Proof of Service Mon 08/08 11:19 AM
Proof of Service of Order Severing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b). Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC Related [+]. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, August 05, 2016
16 16 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/05 3:19 PM
Order Severing the Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) . Service Instructions: Amy Harris is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Sabrina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
15 15 misc Notice Of Change of Address - Party Thu 08/27 2:54 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor Rabo AgriFinance, Inc. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Individual or Firm Name - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 06/23 10:25 AM
Change of Firm Name Submitted to the Court on June 15, 2015 by Amy Harris of Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Prosser, P.A. Now Known as Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
trustee (NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Tue 06/02 6:54 PM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on Monday, June 1, 2015 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Barnett, Denise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2015
14 14 misc SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules) Thu 05/28 6:03 PM
Summary of Schedules , Schedules A - H, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
13 13 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/27 2:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert C Schermer on behalf of Creditor Old Florida Investments, Inc.. (Schermer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 09, 2015
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Operating Order Sun 05/10 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Operating Order Related [+]. Notice Date 05/09/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, May 07, 2015
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Fri 05/08 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 05/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Fri 05/08 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
9 9 order Order To File All State and Federal Tax Returns and Pay Taxes When Due Wed 05/06 9:15 PM
Order to File All State and Federal Tax Returns and Pay Taxes When Due . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 05/06 10:12 AM
List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Equity Security Holders Wed 05/06 9:29 AM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 05/05 4:05 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Joint Administration Tue 05/05 11:40 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (Lead Case No 8:15-bk-04671-MGW) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Amy Harris is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Alyssa)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Tue 05/05 9:49 AM
Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/1/2015 at 02:30 PM at Tampa, FL (861) - Room 100-B, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Proofs of Claims due by 8/17/2015. (Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice Of Deficient Filing Tue 05/05 9:37 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Summary of Schedules, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Disclosure of Compensation, 20 Largest, Chapter 11 Case Mgmt Summary . Compliance required no later than 5/18/2015. (Ryan)
Related: [-]
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Tue 05/05 11:59 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC Related [+]. (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-] 5
assign Assign Judge and Trustee to Electronically Filed Cases Tue 05/05 7:40 AM
Assignment of the Honorable Michael G. Williamson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee . (Ellen M.)
Related: [-]
court (NO PAPER) - Notice Of Consolidation/Joint Administration of Cases Tue 05/05 3:31 PM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases. No further papers to be docketed in this case. All papers should be docketed in Case No. 8:15-bk-04671-MGW Related [+]. (Sabrina)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, May 04, 2015
2 2 motion Motion for Joint Administration Mon 05/04 5:46 PM
Expedited Motion for Joint Administration of Lead Case 8:15-bk-4675 with 8:15-bk-4672, 8:15-bk-4673, 8:15-bk-4674, and 8:15-bk-4675 Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of Debtor SamWes, LLC (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/04 5:24 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Amy Denton Harris on behalf of SamWes, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/1/2015 Disclosure Statement due by 09/1/2015 (Harris, Amy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 05/04 5:25 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:15-bk-04675) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 45269312, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Mon 05/04 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]