Member Case
Lead case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:15-bk-32478
Case Filed:May 12, 2015
Terminated:Mar 02, 2016

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
10 10 order Final Decree Wed 03/02 10:38 AM
Final Decree, the Final Report of the Debtor is approved, the Motion for Final Decree is granted, and the case is hereby closed (See Case 15-32450 KLP for Final Report and Motion for Final Decree). (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
9 9 misc Declaration Mon 07/06 4:12 PM
Amended Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules Related [+] filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Mountain View Coal Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Filed filed by Mountain View Coal Company, LLC
Friday, June 26, 2015
8 8 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Fri 06/26 8:19 PM
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Peter Barrett of Kutak Rock L.L.P. on behalf of Mountain View Coal Company, LLC. (Barrett, Peter)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Fri 06/26 8:12 PM
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Schedules of Assets and Liabilities filed by Peter Barrett of Kutak Rock L.L.P. on behalf of Mountain View Coal Company, LLC. (Barrett, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
6 6 claims Withdrawal of Claim Wed 05/27 11:44 AM
Withdrawal of Claim 1 of Discover Student Loans filed by Mountain View Coal Company, LLC.(Roman, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
5 5 court Hearing held Wed 05/13 6:03 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Appearances: Michael Condyles and Stephen Hessler for Debtors; Related [+]. (Gibbs, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Mountain View Coal Company, LLC
4 4 order Order on Motion for Joint Administration Wed 05/13 5:30 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+], Related Case 3:15-bk-32450. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Patriot Coal Corporation; Apogee Coal Company, LLC; Appalachia Mine Services, LLC; Black Stallion Coal Company, LLC; Brody Mining, LLC; Catenary Coal Company, LLC; Central States Coal Reserves of KY, LLC; Colony Bay Coal Company; Corydon Resources LLC; Coyote Coal Company LLC; Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC; Eastern Associated Coal, LLC; Eastern Royalty, LLC; Emerald Processing, L.L.C.; Gateway Eagle Coal Company, LLC; Grand Eagle Mining, LLC; Heritage Coal Company LLC; Highland Mining Company, LLC; Hillside Mining Company; Hobet Mining, LLC; Jupiter Holdings LLC; Kanawha Eagle Coal, LLC; Kanawha River Ventures III, LLC; Little Creek LLC; Midland Trail Energy LLC; Midwest Coal Resources II, LLC; Mountain View Coal Company, LLC; Panther LLC; Patriot Coal Company, L.P.; Patriot Coal Holdings I LLC; Patriot Coal Holdings II LLC; Patriot Coal Sales LLC; Patriot Coal Services LLC; Patriot Leasing Company LLC; Patriot Midwest Holdings, LLC; Patriot Reserve Holdings, LLC; Patriot Ventures LLC; Pine Ridge Coal Company, LLC; Remington LLC; Rhino Eastern JV Holding Company LLC; Rivers Edge Mining, Inc.; Robin Land Company, LLC; Speed Mining LLC; Thunderhill Coal LLC; Wildcat Energy LLC; Wildcat, LLC; Will Scarlet Properties LLC; WWMV JV Holding Company LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 15-32450 (KLP). (Luedecke, Tammy)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
3 3 motion Joint Administration Tue 05/12 1:42 PM
Motion for Joint Administration with 15-32448 15-32449 15-32450 15-32451 15-32452 15-32453 15-32454 15-32455 15-32456 15-32457 15-32458 15-32459 15-32460 15-32461 15-32462 15-32463 15-32464 15-32465 15-32466 15-32467 15-32468 15-32469 15-32470 15-32471 15-32472 15-32473 15-32474 15-32475 15-32476 15-32479 15-32480 15-32481 15-32482 15-32483 15-32484 15-32485 15-32486 15-32487 15-32489 15-32490 15-32492 15-32493 15-32495 15-32497 15-32498 15-32499 15-32500 filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Mountain View Coal Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/12 10:01 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 15-32478 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 21846525, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Tue 05/12 9:49 AM
Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Mountain View Coal Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]