Member Case
Lead case is: 3:15-bk-32450

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Keith L Phillips
Case #: 3:15-bk-32482
Case Filed:May 12, 2015
Terminated:Mar 02, 2016

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 02, 2016
12 12 order Final Decree Wed 03/02 9:03 AM
Final Decree, the Final Report of the Debtor is approved, the Motion for Final Decree is granted, and the case is hereby closed (See Case 15-32450 KLP for Final Report and Motion for Final Decree). (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2015
11 11 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Wed 11/25 10:10 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Adam Nelson regarding Document appears to be filed in the wrong case. Please review this filing and docket to the correct case. Related [+] Document(s) due by 12/9/2015. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Application for Administrative Expenses filed by Alliance Coal, LLC, Alliance Resource Properties, LLC, UC Mining, LLC, and UC Processing, LLC
Tuesday, November 24, 2015
10 10 motion Administrative Expenses Tue 11/24 2:04 PM
Application for Administrative Expenses Related [+] filed by Adam R. Nelson of Thompson McMullan, P.C. on behalf of Alliance Coal, LLC, Alliance Resource Properties, LLC, UC Mining, LLC, and UC Processing, LLC. (Nelson, Adam)
Related: [-] quest of Alliance Coal, LLC, Alliance Resource Properties, LLC, UC Mining, LLC, and UC Processing, LLC for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim
Monday, July 06, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/06 5:23 PM
Amended Certificate of Service for Notice of Amendment(s) to Affected Parties Related [+] filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Declaration filed by Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC
8 8 misc Declaration Mon 07/06 3:32 PM
Amended Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules Related [+] filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Filed filed by Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC
Friday, June 26, 2015
7 7 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Fri 06/26 8:17 PM
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists (Statement of Financial Affairs) filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists Fri 06/26 8:02 PM
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC. (Condyles, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
5 5 court Hearing held Wed 05/13 5:55 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Appearances: Michael Condyles and Stephen Hessler for Debtors; Related [+]. (Gibbs, Peggy)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC
4 4 order Order on Motion for Joint Administration Wed 05/13 5:33 PM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration Related [+], Related Case 3:15-bk-32450. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Virginia directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Patriot Coal Corporation; Apogee Coal Company, LLC; Appalachia Mine Services, LLC; Black Stallion Coal Company, LLC; Brody Mining, LLC; Catenary Coal Company, LLC; Central States Coal Reserves of KY, LLC; Colony Bay Coal Company; Corydon Resources LLC; Coyote Coal Company LLC; Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC; Eastern Associated Coal, LLC; Eastern Royalty, LLC; Emerald Processing, L.L.C.; Gateway Eagle Coal Company, LLC; Grand Eagle Mining, LLC; Heritage Coal Company LLC; Highland Mining Company, LLC; Hillside Mining Company; Hobet Mining, LLC; Jupiter Holdings LLC; Kanawha Eagle Coal, LLC; Kanawha River Ventures III, LLC; Little Creek LLC; Midland Trail Energy LLC; Midwest Coal Resources II, LLC; Mountain View Coal Company, LLC; Panther LLC; Patriot Coal Company, L.P.; Patriot Coal Holdings I LLC; Patriot Coal Holdings II LLC; Patriot Coal Sales LLC; Patriot Coal Services LLC; Patriot Leasing Company LLC; Patriot Midwest Holdings, LLC; Patriot Reserve Holdings, LLC; Patriot Ventures LLC; Pine Ridge Coal Company, LLC; Remington LLC; Rhino Eastern JV Holding Company LLC; Rivers Edge Mining, Inc.; Robin Land Company, LLC; Speed Mining LLC; Thunderhill Coal LLC; Wildcat Energy LLC; Wildcat, LLC; Will Scarlet Properties LLC; WWMV JV Holding Company LLC. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 15-32450 (KLP). (Luedecke, Tammy)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
3 3 motion Joint Administration Tue 05/12 1:14 PM
Motion for Joint Administration with 15-32448 15-32449 15-32450 15-32455 15-32460 15-32469 15-32471 15-32474 15-32476 15-32479 15-32480 15-32487 15-32484 15-32489 15-32493 15-32497 15-32499 15-32452 15-32457 15-32461 15-32464 15-32468 15-32470 15-32473 15-32475 15-32478 15-32481 15-32483 15-32485 15-32486 15-32490 15-32492 15-32495 15-32498 15-32500 15-32451 15-32453 15-32454 15-32456 15-32458 15-32459 15-32462 15-32463 15-32465 15-32466 15-32467 15-32472 filed by Michael A. Condyles (T1) of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC. (Condyles (T1), Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/12 10:26 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 15-32482 [misc,824] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 21846954, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Tue 05/12 10:24 AM
Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 Filed by Michael A. Condyles (T1) of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Dodge Hill Mining Company, LLC. (Condyles (T1), Michael)
Related: [-]