Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:13-bk-01520

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:15-ap-00175
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2015
Terminated:Dec 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marshall & Stevens Incorporated
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Ryan C Reinert
Shutts & Bowen LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet R. Kapila, as Chapter 11 Trustee for the estate of UNIVERSAL HEALTH CARE GROUP, INC.
Trenam Kemker P.O. Box 1102
Tampa, FL 33601
Represented By
Lara Roeske Fernandez
Trenam Law
contact info
Lori V Vaughan
Trenam Kemker
contact info
Plaintiff
American Managed Care, LLC
Soneet R. Kapila, Chapter 11 Trustee P.O. Box 14213
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33302
Represented By
Lara Roeske Fernandez
Trenam Law
contact info
Lori V Vaughan
Trenam Kemker
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, December 11, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/11 10:25 AM
Adversary Case 8:15-ap-175 Closed. (Penny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
38 38 order Virtual Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding (TEXT ONLY) Thu 12/10 3:22 PM
Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding. On December 7, 2020, the Court entered an order approving the parties' compromise or settlement agreement in the main bankruptcy case, Doc. No. 2265. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this adversary proceeding is administratively closed. This order is without prejudice to any party's moving to reopen the adversary proceeding for the purpose of seeking relief in connection with matters or disputes arising from or related to the compromise or settlement agreement. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Caryl E. Delano (text-only order). Related Bankruptcy Case Number: 8:13-bk-01520-CED Universal Health Care Group, Inc.. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Anel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
court Compromise Cross-Reference Wed 11/18 3:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:13-bk-01520-CED Universal Health Care Group, Inc., Doc No. 2265 . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 10/20 2:00 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:13-bk-01520-CED Universal Health Care Group, Inc. . (Anel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2020
37 37 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 09/29 5:46 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lara Fernandez, Soneet Kapila, Ryan Reinert WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Status Conference- Continued to 11/16/2020 at 1:30 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given **Settled/9019 motion to be filed** . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
36 36 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Thu 08/13 2:50 PM
Notice of Mediation Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
35 35 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 07/16 8:33 AM
Agreed Order Amending Order Directing Mediation (The mediation conference shall be conducted no later than September 15, 2020.) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Lara Fernandez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 33 ,29
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Thu 07/16 8:50 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 35
Friday, March 27, 2020
34 34 order Extend Time Fri 03/27 11:33 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Select Mediator to April 8, 2020 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Lara Fernandez is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 33
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Fri 03/27 11:46 AM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-] 34
Thursday, March 26, 2020
33 33 motion Motion to Extend Time Thu 03/26 5:18 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Select Mediator Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 13, 2020
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/14 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/13/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #29 )
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
31 31 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/11 3:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila. (Fernandez, Lara)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order Directing Mediation Wed 03/11 7:38 AM
Order Directing Mediation . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Christiane)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
30 30 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 03/11 10:25 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Ryan Reinert, Rhys Leonard WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Status Conference - Both matters continued to 7/27/2020 at 1:30 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
28 28 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 12/03 6:48 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lori Vaughan, Ryan Reinert WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Status Conference- Continued to 3/9/2020 at 2:00 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
27 27 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 11/14 12:31 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lori Vaughan, Ryan Reinert WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Status Conference - Continued to 12/2/2019 at 2:00 pm, Announced in Open Court NoFurther Notice Given . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
26 26 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 03/26 10:01 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Robert Schotzman, Allison Carroll, Rhys Leonard, Ryan Reinert WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Continued Status Conference - Continued to 11/12/2019 at 1:30 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
25 25 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 09/19 11:24 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Laurie Vaughan, J Steven Wilkes, Jack Kallus, Adam Schwartz, Steven Solomon, David Metcalf, Leon Williamson, Ryan Barack, Chris McRae, Ryan Reinert WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: *Status Conference - Continued to 3/25/2019 at 2:00 pm, Announced in Open Court No Further Notice Given . Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
24 24 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 04/11 3:35 PM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 9/18/2018 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 motion Motion to Abate Wed 04/11 1:29 PM
Stipulated Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Wed 04/11 3:37 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 24
Thursday, January 18, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Fri 01/19 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #21 )
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
21 21 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling Tue 01/16 10:01 AM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/12/2018 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N Florida Avenue. (Lisa M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
court COURT - Notice Of Reassignment of Case (batch) Mon 12/18 10:36 AM
Notice of Reassignment of Case to The Honorable Caryl E. Delano. (Mike)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2017
20 20 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 10/04 1:50 PM
Order on Stipulated Motion for Abatement of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2018 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Alyssa)
Related: [-] 19
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Wed 10/04 1:55 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
19 19 motion Motion to Abate Tue 10/03 3:26 PM
Stipulated Motion to Abate Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
court Hearing Continued Wed 08/16 2:09 PM
Hearing Continued from 8/31/2017 to 10/5/2017. . Status Conference to be held on 10/5/2017 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (JEANINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
18 18 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 02/09 4:29 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lori Vaughan, Ryan Reinert. RULING: Status Conference - Continued to 8/31/2017 at 11:00 am, Announced in Open Court. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
17 17 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 09/01 1:13 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Ryan C Reinert on behalf of Defendant Marshall & Stevens Incorporated. Related [+]
Related: [-] inert, Ryan
Friday, August 19, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sat 08/20 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
Thursday, August 18, 2016
15 15 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 08/19 2:06 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Lori Vaughan, Ryan Reinert. RULING: Status Conference - Continued to 2/9/2017 at 11:00 am. Announced in open court. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
14 14 court Notice Of Deficient Filing Wed 08/17 11:15 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Statement of Corporate Ownership Related [+]. Compliance required no later than 9/6/2016. (Anel)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
13 13 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/16 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ryan C Reinert on behalf of Defendant Marshall & Stevens Incorporated. Related [+]
Related: [-] inert, Ryan
Thursday, February 04, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/04 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order on Stipulated Motion to Abate Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, February 03, 2016
11 11 order Order (Generic) Wed 02/03 3:57 PM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/18/2016 at 03:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 9B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Motion to Abate Wed 02/03 3:04 PM
Stipulated Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/17 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori) Modified on 6/18/2015 (Anel).
Related: [-] 8
Monday, June 15, 2015
8 8 Order Granting Motion To Abate Adversary Proceeding (for a period of 120 days) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, June 11, 2015
7 7 Stipulated Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
6 6 Certificate of Service Re: Order Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
5 5 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Service of Summons, Obtain Pluries Summons to May 8, 2015 and Seek Entry of Default under Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 to June 8, 2015. Related [+]. Service Instructions: Lori Vaughan is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
4 4 Motion to Extend Time for Defendant's Response and Entry of Default Under Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
3 3 Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 on Marshall & Stevens Incorporated Filed by Lori V Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs American Managed Care, LLC, Soneet R. Kapila Related [+]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, February 06, 2015
2 2 [LINK:Summons Issued] Summons Issued on Marshall & Stevens Incorporated . Answer Due 03/9/2015. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint by Soneet R. Kapila, American Managed Care, LLC against Marshall & Stevens Incorporated. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [13 Related [+]],[14],[02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Vaughan, Lori)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A