Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-14066

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:A Jay Cristol
Case #: 1:15-ap-01429
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2015
Terminated:Oct 16, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
TotalBank
Represented By
TotalBank
contact info
Plaintiff
100 M Franchise, LLC
Represented By
Paul J. Battista, Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, October 16, 2015
21 21 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/16 10:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:15-ap-1429 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Cargill, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 27, 2015
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/28 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/27/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice.
Friday, September 25, 2015
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/25 2:45 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff 100 M Franchise, LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 18 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
18 18 order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/25 2:39 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 09/25 11:34 AM
Agreed Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff 100 M Franchise, LLC. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 04, 2015
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/05 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 09/04/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Granting Second Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Re:13 ). TotalBank Answer Deadline: 09/30/2015.
Thursday, September 03, 2015
15 15 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 09/03 1:26 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Drew M Dillworth Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
14 14 order Extend Time Order Wed 09/02 3:16 PM
Order Granting Second Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+]. TotalBank Answer Deadline: 09/30/2015. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] #13
Monday, August 31, 2015
13 13 motion Extend Time Mon 08/31 5:29 PM
Second Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendant TotalBank (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 15, 2015
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/16 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/15/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Agreed Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion by Plaintiff, 100 M Franchise LLC, to Continue Pretrial Conference and Extend Related Pretrial Deadlines Re: (1 Complaint) (Re:9 ). Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/19/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128.
Friday, August 14, 2015
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/14 11:05 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff 100 M Franchise, LLC Related [+]. (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing, Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, August 13, 2015
10 10 order Continue Hearing Order Thu 08/13 3:27 PM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion by Plaintiff, 100 M Franchise LLC, to Continue Pretrial Conference and Extend Related Pretrial Deadlines Re: (1 Complaint) Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/19/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] #9
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
9 9 motion Continue Hearing Tue 08/11 5:20 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing On: [(1 Complaint)] , Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Related Pretrial Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff 100 M Franchise, LLC (Gayo-Guitian, Mariaelena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/06 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Comply with Related Rule 26 Disclosures (Re:5 ). Deadline: 08/31/2015.
Monday, August 03, 2015
7 7 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 08/03 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Drew M Dillworth Related [+]. (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, July 31, 2015
6 6 order Extend Time Order Fri 07/31 10:50 PM
Order Granting Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Comply with Related Rule 26 Disclosures Related [+]. Deadline: 08/31/2015. (Covington, Katrinka)
Related: [-] #5
Thursday, July 30, 2015
5 5 motion Extend Time Thu 07/30 3:03 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Comply with Related Rule 26 Disclosures Filed by Defendant TotalBank (Dillworth, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/30 11:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on TotalBank 6/30/2015 Filed by Plaintiff 100 M Franchise, LLC, Defendant TotalBank. (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Tue 06/30 9:35 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 30 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 06/30 9:33 AM
Summons Issued on TotalBank Answer Due 7/30/2015 [Trial Shall be Held During One-Week Trial Period Beginning on the Date of Pretrial] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Rios, Amber)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 100 M Franchise, LLC
Thursday, June 25, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/25 9:41 PM
Adversary case 15-01429 Complaint by 100 M Franchise, LLC against TotalBank. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Battista, Paul)
Related: [-]