Member Case
Lead case is: 1:11-bk-12574

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:11-bk-12570
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Sep 17, 2013
Converted:Aug 13, 2013
Terminated:Sep 27, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Jun 20, 2012

Debtor
Priva Financial Services, Inc.
10591 Country Club Dr
Richland, MI 49083-9588
Represented By
Joseph R. Sgroi
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
E. Todd Sable
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Judy B. Calton
Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas C. Richardson
PO Box 51067
Kalamazoo, MI 49005
Represented By
Rachel L. Hillegonds
Miller Johnson
contact info
John T. Piggins
Miller Johnson
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Dean E. Rietberg
Trial Attorney Office of the US Trustee The Ledyard Building, 2nd Floor 125 Ottawa NW, Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503


Docket last updated: 08/03/2015 5:11 PM EDT
Thursday, December 22, 2011
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-12570 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt number 7735933, amount $1046.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Notice to Debtor(s) Counsel to File Conventionally with the Court Debtor(s) Declaration Re: ECF Within Seven Days from the Date of Filing or Case will be Dismissed Without Prejudice Pursuant to ECF Guidelines. To obtain a copy of this form, please go to: http://www.miwb.uscourts.gov/cms/assets/Rules-and-Forms/Rules/declarationecf.pdf (clp)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of: 11-12570 11-12574 11-12577 and 11-12578 Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Post-Petition Secured Financing and Scheduling a Final Order Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Authorizing Postpetition Financing
Att: 2 Exhibit Summary
4 4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service; (II) Deeming Utility Providers Adequately Assured of Future Performance; and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Adequate Assurance of Future Payment Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Utility Providers
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions
7 7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Declaration of William Sibert of Priva Technologies, Inc., in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First-Day Motions of Priva Technologies, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Debtor Priva Financial Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of: 11-12570 11-12574 11-12577 and 11-12578 3 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Post-Petition Secured Financing and Scheduling a Final Order ,4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service; (II) Deeming Utility Providers Adequately Assured of Future Performance; and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Addi, 5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures , 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions , 7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Declaration of William Sibert of Priva Technologies, Inc., in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First-Day Motions of Priva Technologies, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors
22 22 Notice of Filing(s) Due. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/5/2012. Summary of schedules due 1/5/2012. Schedules A-H due 1/5/2012. Declaration of Schedules due 1/5/2012. (dr)
Related: [-]