Member Case
Lead case is: 1:11-bk-12574

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey R Hughes
Case #: 1:11-bk-12577
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2011
Dismissed:May 20, 2012
Terminated:Jul 02, 2012

Debtor
Priva Design Services, Inc.
1601 S DE Anza Blvd Ste 248
Cupertino, CA 95014-5350
Represented By
E. Todd Sable
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Joseph R. Sgroi
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Dean E. Rietberg
Trial Attorney Office of the US Trustee The Ledyard Building, 2nd Floor 125 Ottawa NW, Suite 200R
Grand Rapids, MI 49503


Docket last updated: 02/10/2013 2:31 PM EST
Thursday, December 22, 2011
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-12577 [misc,volp11a] (1046.00). Receipt number 7736217, amount $1046.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Notice to Debtor(s) Counsel to File Conventionally with the Court Debtor(s) Declaration Re: ECF Within Seven Days from the Date of Filing or Case will be Dismissed Without Prejudice Pursuant to ECF Guidelines. To obtain a copy of this form, please go to: http://www.miwb.uscourts.gov/cms/assets/Rules-and-Forms/Rules/declarationecf.pdf (clp)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1046 Filed by Priva Design Services, Inc. Schedules A-J due 01/5/2012. Summary of schedules due 01/5/2012. Declaration of Schedules due 01/5/2012. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/5/2012. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of: 11-12570 11-12574 11-12577 and 11-12578 Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Post-Petition Secured Financing and Scheduling a Final Hearing Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Authorizing Post-Petition Financing
Att: 2 Exhibit Summary
4 4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion Debtors' First-Day Motion for Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service; (II) Deeming Utility Providers Adequately Assured of Future Performance; and (III) Establishing Procedures for Determining Additional Adequate Assurance of Future Payment Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List of Utility Providers
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Declaration of William Sibert of Priva Technologies, Inc., in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First-Day Motions of Priva Technologies, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
8 8 Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Debtor Priva Design Services, Inc. (Sgroi, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of: 11-12570 11-12574 11-12577 and 11-12578 3 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Post-Petition Secured Financing and Scheduling a Final Hearing ,4 Chapter 11 First Day Motion Debtors' First-Day Motion for Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service; (II) Deeming Utility Providers Adequately Assured of Future Performance; and (III) Establishing P, 5 Chapter 11 First Day Motion for Authority to Limit Notice and Establish Notice Procedures , 6 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Emergency Hearing Regarding First-Day Motions , 7 Chapter 11 First Day Motion - Declaration of William Sibert of Priva Technologies, Inc., in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First-Day Motions of Priva Technologies, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors